This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/16/2022 at 06:06:22 (UTC).

Obduskey v. Wells Fargo, et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Obduskey filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wells Fargo,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1156

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DENNIS OBDUSKEY

Pueblo, CO 81005

Defendant / Appellees

WELLS FARGO

WELLS FARGO BANK

WELLS FARGO & CO.

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dennis Obduskey

604 Alpine Avenue

Pueblo, CO 81005

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory J. Marshall

Attorney at Snell & Willmer

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Anna Adams

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

1200 17Th Street, Suite 1900

Denver, CO 80202

Andrew Martin Jacobs

Attorney at Snell & Willmer

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Christopher Diedrich

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

1200 17Th Street, Suite 1900

Denver, CO 80202

Holly R. Shilliday

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus

7700 East Arapahoe Road, Suite 230

Englewood, CO 80112

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

[10915645] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Martin Jacobs and Anna Adams for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Wells Fargo & Co. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/25/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [22-1156] [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:36 PM]

Open Document

[10916292] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Holly R. Shilliday for McCarthy & Holthus, LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: US mail [22-1156] [Entered: 05/27/2022 11:37 AM]

Open Document

[10920805] Consent to electronic service filed by Dennis Obduskey. Served on 06/15/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/17/2022 12:05 PM]

Open Document

[10921234] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:50 PM]

Open Document #1

Standard juris rvw comp letter

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #3

form(s) sent

Open Document

[10921494] Entry of appearance filed by Dennis Obduskey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 06/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/22/2022 11:13 AM]

Open Document

[10921938] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. Appellant's brief due on 08/03/2022 for Dennis Obduskey. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/24/2022 07:24 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10921938] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. Appellant's brief due on 08/03/2022 for Dennis Obduskey. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/24/2022 07:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10921494] Entry of appearance filed by Dennis Obduskey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 06/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/22/2022 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10921235] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp forms, appellant's brief and entry of appearance due by 08/01/2022 for Dennis Obduskey. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 07/12/2022 [22-1156] [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10921234] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10920805] Consent to electronic service filed by Dennis Obduskey. Served on 06/15/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-1156] [Entered: 06/17/2022 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10916292] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Holly R. Shilliday for McCarthy & Holthus, LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: US mail [22-1156] [Entered: 05/27/2022 11:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket[10916279] Entry of appearance submitted by Holly Renee Shilliday for Appellee McCarthy & Holthus, LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail.--[Edited 05/27/2022 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 05/27/2022] [22-1156] HRS [Entered: 05/27/2022 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10915645] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Martin Jacobs and Anna Adams for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Wells Fargo & Co. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/25/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [22-1156] [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Docket[10915635] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew M. Jacobs and Anna M. Adams for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/25/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 05/25/2022 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [22-1156] AA [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10913851] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/17/2022 Fee or ifp forms and notice of appearance due 06/16/2022 for Dennis Obduskey. Notice of appearance due on 05/31/2022 for McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. [22-1156] [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less