This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/24/2021 at 22:46:12 (UTC).

NuCurrent, Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 NuCurrent, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1840

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

NUCURRENT, INC.

Appellee

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Jon Wright

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Jonathan Tuminaro Ph.D.

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

William Milliken

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Bradley Ray

Attorney at Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Appellee Attorneys

Naveen Modi

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Paul Anderson

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

600 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

Chetan Bansal

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Joseph Palys

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#2

4 #1

Certified List

4 #2

Notices of Appeal

4 #3

Public Decisions

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certified list received. Service: 05/24/2021 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [777421] [21-1840, 21-1841, 21-1842, 21-1843, 21-1844, 21-1845] [EKD] [Entered: 05/27/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/27/2021 by email. [771532] [21-1840] [Naveen Modi] [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/27/2021 by email. [771531] [21-1840] [Naveen Modi] [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Naveen Modi; Joseph E. Palys; Paul M. Anderson; Chetan Bansal as counsel for Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/27/2021 by email. [771530] [21-1840] [Naveen Modi] [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant NuCurrent, Inc.. Service: 04/27/2021 by email. [771372] [21-1840] [Jonathan Tuminaro] [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant NuCurrent, Inc.. Service: 04/27/2021 by email. [771370] [21-1840] [Jonathan Tuminaro] [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Jonathan Tuminaro; Michael B. Ray; Jon E. Wright; William H. Milliken as counsel for Appellant NuCurrent, Inc.. Service: 04/27/2021 by email. [771368] [21-1840] [Jonathan Tuminaro] [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) Note to File: The following cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel: 21-1605, -1606, -1607 and 21-1840, -1841, -1842, -1843, -1844, -1845. [770130] [21-1605, 21-1840] [EKD] [Entered: 04/21/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1840 Lead with 21-1841, 21-1842, 21-1843, 21-1844, and 21-1845 Consolidated Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [770125] [21-1840, 21-1841, 21-1842, 21-1843, 21-1844, 21-1845] [EKD] [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 21-1840, 21-1841, 21-1842, 21-1843, 21-1844, and 21-1845. The Certified Lists are due no later than May 24, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [770124] [21-1840, 21-1841, 21-1842, 21-1843, 21-1844, 21-1845] [EKD] [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/08/2021. [768333] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/27/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/27/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 04/27/2021. Certified List is due on 05/24/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 04/13/2021 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NuCurrent, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Palys

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naveen Modi