This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/22/2022 at 06:03:21 (UTC).

NTT Data IntL v. Zurich Amer Ins

Case Summary

On 02/21/2022 NTT Data IntL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich Amer Ins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10172

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

NTT Data International, L.L.C.

NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V.

Defendant / Appellee

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

LaDawn H. Nandrasy Esq.

Amy Elizabeth Stewart

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Karl Andrew Schulz

Alicia Grace Curran Esq.

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. [22-10172] (MVM) [Entered: 02/21/2022 03:29 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [22-10172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 02/24/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Curran; Attorney for Appellant: Stewart [22-10172] (Amy Elizabeth Stewart ) [Entered: 02/24/2022 10:44 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for Doc #39, motion to alter judgment 59(e). [9784412-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:44 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amy Elizabeth Stewart for NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10172] (Amy Elizabeth Stewart ) [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:07 PM]

Open Document #1

Attorney Appearance Filed

Open Document #2

Notice of Form for Appearance of LaDawn H. Nandrasy

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10172] (Robert Fountain ) [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10172] (Alicia Grace Curran ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 04:33 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. to withdraw as counsel [9807694-2]. Date of service: 03/25/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Curran; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Nandrasy, Stewart [22-10172] (LaDawn H. Nandrasy ) [Entered: 03/25/2022 06:23 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. [ # 9807694-2 ] [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 03/28/2022 08:43 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10172] (Karl Andrew Schulz ) [Entered: 04/07/2022 04:51 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Karl Andrew Schulz for party(s) Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company, in case 22-10172 [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 04/11/2022 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10172] (Karl Andrew Schulz ) [Entered: 04/07/2022 04:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. [ # 9807694-2 ] [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 03/28/2022 08:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. to withdraw as counsel [9807694-2]. Date of service: 03/25/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Curran; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Nandrasy, Stewart [22-10172] (LaDawn H. Nandrasy ) [Entered: 03/25/2022 06:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alicia Grace Curran for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company in 22-10172 [22-10172] (CB) [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10172] (Alicia Grace Curran ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 04:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Amy Elizabeth Stewart for party(s) Appellant NTT Data International, L.L.C. Appellant NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V., in case 22-10172 [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 03/02/2022 10:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) LaDawn H. Nandrasy for party(s) Appellant NTT Data International, L.L.C. Appellant NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V., in case 22-10172 [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 03/02/2022 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Fountain for party(s) Appellant NTT Data International, L.L.C. Appellant NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V., in case 22-10172 [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 03/02/2022 10:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10172] (Robert Fountain ) [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10172] (LaDawn H. Nandrasy ) [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amy Elizabeth Stewart for NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10172] (Amy Elizabeth Stewart ) [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for Doc #39, motion to alter judgment 59(e). [9784412-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [22-10172] (MFY) [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [22-10172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 02/24/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Curran; Attorney for Appellant: Stewart [22-10172] (Amy Elizabeth Stewart ) [Entered: 02/24/2022 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. [22-10172] (MVM) [Entered: 02/21/2022 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants NTT Data International, L.L.C. and NTT Data Services International Holdings, B.V. [22-10172] (MVM) [Entered: 02/21/2022 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less