This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/06/2021 at 06:04:23 (UTC).

NPF Franchising, LLC v. Sy Dawgs, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 NPF Franchising, LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Sy Dawgs, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3516

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NPF FRANCHISING, LLC

Interested Parties

KATHRYN B. FOX

TRACY A. WARREN

J. PATRICK ALLEN

BUCHALTER, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

RICK A. WALTMAN

Defendant / Appellees

CONNIE A. MAY

KTC INTERESTS, LLC

SCRAP YARD FAST PITCH, LLC

SY DAWGS, LLC

JOEL A. BARTSCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Lauren Ashley Gribble

Attorney at Plakas Mannos

200 Market Avenue, N.Suite 300

Canton, OH 44702

Lee E. Plakas

Attorney at Plakas Mannos

200 Market Avenue, N.Suite 300

Canton, OH 44702

Edmond James Mack

Attorney at Plakas Mannos

200 Market Avenue, N.Suite 300

Canton, OH 44702

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William M. Harter

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd

10 W. Broad Streetsuite 2300

Columbus, OH 43215

Yazan Samir Ashrawi

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd

10 W. Broad Streetsuite 2300

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#22

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/14/2021;. appellee brief due 10/14/2021; (VLP) [Entered: 08/05/2021 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#21) Transcript, [17], has been filed in the District Court on 08/04/2021 ; Court Reporter: Mr. Lance Boardman ; Actual Number of Pages: 64 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 2 ; [21-3516] (LB) [Entered: 08/04/2021 09:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#20) NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [17] Transcript to be filed in district court by Lance Boardman by 08/05/2021. (VLP) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#19) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Mr. Lance Boardman, for transcript [17] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 06/29/2021 ; Estimated completion date: 07/29/2021 ; Estimated number of pages: 64 . [21-3516] (LB) [Entered: 07/02/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#18) NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [17]. Lance Boardman's acknowledgement is due 07/06/2021. (VLP) [Entered: 06/21/2021 07:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docket(#17) TRANSCRIPT ordered from Mr. Lance Boardman, filed by Mr. Edmond James Mack for J. Patrick Allen, Buchalter, A Professional Corporation, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman and Tracy A. Warren. [17] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 06/18/2021 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. ; Hearing Dates: (1) 2/23/2018 Pre-Hearing Conference, and (2) 3/23/2018 Oral Argument ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 06/18/2021. [21-3516] (EJM) [Entered: 06/18/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants J. Patrick Allen, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman, Tracy A. Warren and Buchalter, A Professional Corporation by Lauren A. Gribble. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2021. [21-3516] (LAG) [Entered: 06/09/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William M. Harter for Appellee Sy Dawgs, LLC. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2021. [21-3516]--[Edited 06/09/2021 by JAC] (WMH) [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William M. Harter for Appellee Scrap Yard Fast Pitch, LLC. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2021. [21-3516]--[Edited 06/09/2021 by JAC] (WMH) [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William M. Harter for Appellee KTC Interests, LLC Certificate of Service: 06/09/2021. [21-3516]--[Edited 06/09/2021 by JAC] (WMH) [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF DOCUMENT *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Connie A. May, Ktc Interests, LLC, Scrap Yard Fast Pitch, LLC and Sy Dawgs, LLC by Yazan S. Ashrawi. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2021. [21-3516]--[Edited 06/09/2021 by JAC] (YSA) [Entered: 06/09/2021 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF DOCUMENT *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Sy Dawgs, LLC, Ktc Interests, LLC, Scrap Yard Fast Pitch, LLC and Connie A. May by William M. Harter. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2021. [21-3516]--[Edited 06/09/2021 by JAC] (WMH) [Entered: 06/09/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/08/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 06/08/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Edmond James Mack for Appellants J. Patrick Allen, Buchalter, A Professional Corporation, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman and Tracy A. Warren.. Certificate of Service: 06/07/2021. [21-3516] (EJM) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edmond James Mack for Appellants J. Patrick Allen, Buchalter, A Professional Corporation, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman and Tracy A. Warren Certificate of Service: 06/07/2021. [21-3516] (EJM) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants J. Patrick Allen, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman, Tracy A. Warren and Buchalter, A Professional Corporation by Edmond J. Mack. Certificate of Service: 06/07/2021. [21-3516] (EJM) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants J. Patrick Allen, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman, Tracy A. Warren and Buchalter, A Professional Corporation by Lee E. Plakas. Certificate of Service: 06/07/2021. [21-3516] (LEP) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 06/07/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants J. Patrick Allen, Buchalter, A Professional Corporation, Kathryn B. Fox, Rick A. Waltman and Tracy A. Warren. Transcript needed: y. (VLP) [Entered: 06/07/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUCHALTER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yazan S Ashrawi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William M. Harter