This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/28/2020 at 06:07:55 (UTC).

NP Parc Chateaux, LLC v. Michael Perry

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 NP Parc Chateaux, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Michael Perry. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55465

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

MICHAEL MOSHE PERRY

West Hills, CA 91307

Plaintiff / Appellee

NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Michael Moshe Perry

23705 Vanowen St. No. 262

West Hills, CA 91307

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

LInda Tracey Hollenbeck

Attorney at Law Offices of Hollenbeck & Cardoso, LLP

7755 Center Avenue, Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Tania K. Cardoso Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Hollenbeck & Cardoso, LLP

7755 Center Avenue, Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

 

Court Documents

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11717535] (CKP) [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael Moshe Perry opening brief due 07/02/2020. Appellee NP Parc Chateaux, LLC answering brief due 08/03/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11675982] (RT) [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NP Parc Chateaux, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tania Kim Cardoso