This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2019 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

Nowell v. Covidien, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Nowell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Covidien. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2073

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

COVIDIEN, PLC

MEDTRONIC PLC

Defendant / Appellees

MEDTRONIC, INC.

COVIDIEN, LP

Plaintiff / Appellant

JANICE NOWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alex Walker

Attorney at Modrall Sperling

500 Fourth Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph G. Petrosinelli

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Lisa Schiavo Blatt

Attorney at William & Connolly

725 12Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Haley Wasserman

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Amy Mason Saharia

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jason S. Montclare

Attorney at Jason S. Montclare Law Office

P.O. Box 2463

Alamogordo, NM 88311

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10656653] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/18/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/29/2019 for Janice Nowell. [19-2073] [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document

[10650304] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Haley Wasserman for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP and Ms. Amy Mason Saharia for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(Most of the parties listed were previously disclosed were counsel of record). Served on 05/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2073] [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:59 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10648587] Transcript order form filed by Mary Seal (8/10/18 hearing). Transcript due 06/13/2019 for Mary Seal. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/14/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document

[10648513] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Alex Walker for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(The parties listed were previously disclosed). Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:23 AM]

Open Document

[10648458] Entry of appearance filed by Lisa Schiavo Blatt for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2073] [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:47 AM]

Open Document

[10648042] Docketing statement filed by Janice Nowell. Served on 05/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] JSM [Entered: 05/12/2019 10:21 AM]

Open Document

[10647633] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Janice Nowell. Transcript ordered: Motion Hearing, August 10, 2018. Served on: 05/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] JSM [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:42 PM]

Open Document

[10645665] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 06/03/2019 for Jason S. Montclare. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:43 AM]

Open Document

[10645436] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jason S. Montclare for Janice Nowell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2073] [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:15 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10656653] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/18/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/29/2019 for Janice Nowell. [19-2073] [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • [10656478] Notice filed that the transcript was filed by Mary Seal in district court. Notice due that record is complete by 06/25/2019 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court. [19-2073] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • [10650849] Attorney Mr. Jason S. Montclare for Janice Nowell admitted to the bar of this court. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10650304] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Haley Wasserman for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP and Ms. Amy Mason Saharia for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(Most of the parties listed were previously disclosed were counsel of record). Served on 05/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2073] [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • [10650275] Entry of appearance submitted by Haley Laura Wasserman and Amy Mason Saharia for Appellees Covidien, LP and Medtronic, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] --[Edited 05/21/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 5/21/2019.] HW [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10650030] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 06/03/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-2073] [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10648587] Transcript order form filed by Mary Seal (8/10/18 hearing). Transcript due 06/13/2019 for Mary Seal. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/14/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10648513] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Alex Walker for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(The parties listed were previously disclosed). Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • [10648490] Entry of appearance submitted by Alex C. Walker for Appellees Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] --[Edited 05/14/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 5/14/2019.] AW [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10648458] Entry of appearance filed by Lisa Schiavo Blatt for Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2073] [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • [10648439] Entry of appearance submitted by Lisa S. Blatt for Appellees Covidien, LP and Medtronic, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 05/14/2019 by NA] LSB [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10648042] Docketing statement filed by Janice Nowell. Served on 05/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] JSM [Entered: 05/12/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • [10647634] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 05/23/2019 for Mary Seal.. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-2073] (Motion hearing of 8/10/18) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647633] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Janice Nowell. Transcript ordered: Motion Hearing, August 10, 2018. Served on: 05/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073] JSM [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645665] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 06/03/2019 for Jason S. Montclare. [19-2073] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645436] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jason S. Montclare for Janice Nowell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2073] [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • [10645432] Entry of appearance submitted by Jason S. Montclare, Esq. for Appellant Janice Nowell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2073]--[Edited 05/01/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 5/1/2019] JSM [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645147] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/30/2019 Docketing statement due 05/14/2019 for Janice Nowell. Transcript order form due 05/14/2019 for Janice Nowell. Notice of appearance due on 05/14/2019 for Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc., and Janice Nowell. [19-2073] [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less