This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/02/2019 at 06:08:48 (UTC).

Northland Casualty Company v. Joseph Mulroy, et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Northland Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Joseph Mulroy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35085

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHLAND CASUALTY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation

Defendant

JOSEPH S. MULROY, DBA Yorlum Ranch, DBA Yorlum Ranch, Ltd.

Defendant / Appellants

NORTHWEST LOG HOMES, LLC

DUANE KEIM

3Rd Party Defendant

GLACIER INSURANCE OF LIBBY, INC., a Montana corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marshal Lee Mickelson

Attorney at Corette Pohlman and Kebe

129 W. Park Street

Butte, MT 59703

Annie Nicklay Harris Esquire

Attorney at Corette Black Carlson & Mickelson, P.C.

129 W Park St., Suite 301

Butte, MT 59701

Defendant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James Devlan Geddes

Attorney at Goetz, Baldwin & Geddes, P.C.

35 North Grand Avenue, P.O. Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Hallie Bishop

Attorney at Goetz, Baldwin & Geddes, P.C.

35 North Grand Avenue, P.O. Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Trent M. Gardner

Attorney at Goetz, Baldwin & Geddes, P.C.

35 North Grand Avenue, P.O. Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11234333] (VS) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:39 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/19/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11214377] (CL) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:13 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Northland Casualty Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/08/2019. [11184012] [19-35085] (Mickelson, Marshal) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:35 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Joseph S. Mulroy and Northwest Log Homes, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/07/2019. [11182874] [19-35085] (Geddes, James) [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:31 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • (#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellants Duane Keim, Joseph S. Mulroy and Northwest Log Homes, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Duane Keim, Joseph S. Mulroy and Northwest Log Homes, LLC opening brief due 05/01/2019. Appellee Northland Casualty Company answering brief due 05/31/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11247628] (JN) [Entered: 04/01/2019 07:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Duane Keim, Joseph S. Mulroy and Northwest Log Homes, LLC. New requested due date is 05/01/2019. [11247603] [19-35085] (Geddes, James) [Entered: 04/01/2019 07:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11234333] (VS) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/19/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11214377] (CL) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/08/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11184176] (AD) [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Northland Casualty Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/08/2019. [11184012] [19-35085] (Mickelson, Marshal) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/07/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11183345] (AD) [Entered: 02/07/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Joseph S. Mulroy and Northwest Log Homes, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/07/2019. [11182874] [19-35085] (Geddes, James) [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/08/2019. Appellants Duane Keim, Joseph S. Mulroy and Northwest Log Homes, LLC opening brief due 04/01/2019. Appellee Northland Casualty Company answering brief due 05/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11175418] (JBS) [Entered: 02/01/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northland Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trent M. Gardner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Devlan Geddes