This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:58 (UTC).

Northern Natural Gas v. Huff Landowner Group, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Northern Natural Gas filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Huff Landowner Group. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3139

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Counter Claimant

HUFF LANDOWNER GROUP

Plaintiff / Appellee

NORTHERN NATURAL GAS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ryan Meyer

Attorney at Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch

301 North Main

Wichita, KS 67202

Daniel E. Lawrence

Attorney at Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch

301 North Main

Wichita, KS 67202

John D. Beverlin II

Attorney at Stull, Beverlin, Nicolay & Haas

1320 East First Street

Pratt, KS 67124

David G. Seely

Attorney at Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch

301 North Main

Wichita, KS 67202

Stephen E. Robison Esq.

Attorney at Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch

301 North Main

Wichita, KS 67202

Gregory J. Stucky

Attorney at Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch

301 North Main

Wichita, KS 67202

Gordon B. Stull

Attorney at Stull, Beverlin, Nicolay & Haas

1320 East First Street

Pratt, KS 67124

Stephen E. Robison

Attorney at Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch

301 North Main

Wichita, KS 67202

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paula Jantzen

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mark Coldiron

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Richard Allen Olmstead

Attorney at Kutak Rock

111 South Whittier, Suite 110

Wichita, KS 67207-1045

Corey A. Neller Esq.

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Corey A. Neller

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10673156] Appellant/Petitioner's supplement to memorandum brief filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on 08/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3139]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by KLP to clarify the docket text.] DGS [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:02 PM]

Open Document

[10670914] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the appellant groups in each of the three remaining appeals to file a supplement to their memorandum brief providing any additional argument they wish the court to consider in deciding its jurisdiction. (Supplemental brief due 08/26/2019 for Huff Landowner Group, Meiries Landowner Group and Pratt Well Service Defendants.) Served on 08/15/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143] [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:55 AM]

Open Document

[10669626] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on 08/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3139] DGS [Entered: 08/09/2019 10:46 AM]

Open Document

[10667684] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/01/2019. [19-3139] [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:25 PM]

Open Document

[10667039] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ryan Meyer, Mr. Stephen E. Robison, Mr. David G. Seely, and Mr. Gregory J. Stucky for Huff Landowner Group. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:45 PM]

Open Document

[10667006] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] DGS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:06 PM]

Open Document

[10667001] Docketing statement filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] DGS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

[10666961] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Coldiron and Ms. Corey A. Neller for Northern Natural Gas Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:10 PM]

Open Document

[10667357] Jurisdiction challenged. The appellant groups in each of these appeals shall file memorandum briefs addressing the finality of the orders on appeal due 08/14/19. Alternatively, any appellant group may voluntarily dismiss all or any portion of their respective appeal or elect not to file a response. Each appellant group shall caption their response only for their respective appeal and file it only in that appeal, unless two or more appellant groups elect to file a joint response, in which case the response should be captioned and filed in each appeal to which it applies (see order for details). [19-3137, 19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143] [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:37 PM]

Open Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #2

Preliminary Record

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673156] Appellant/Petitioner's supplement to memorandum brief filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on 08/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3139]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by KLP to clarify the docket text.] DGS [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670914] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the appellant groups in each of the three remaining appeals to file a supplement to their memorandum brief providing any additional argument they wish the court to consider in deciding its jurisdiction. (Supplemental brief due 08/26/2019 for Huff Landowner Group, Meiries Landowner Group and Pratt Well Service Defendants.) Served on 08/15/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143] [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10669626] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on 08/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3139] DGS [Entered: 08/09/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667684] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/01/2019. [19-3139] [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667357] Jurisdiction challenged. The appellant groups in each of these appeals shall file memorandum briefs addressing the finality of the orders on appeal due 08/14/19. Alternatively, any appellant group may voluntarily dismiss all or any portion of their respective appeal or elect not to file a response. Each appellant group shall caption their response only for their respective appeal and file it only in that appeal, unless two or more appellant groups elect to file a joint response, in which case the response should be captioned and filed in each appeal to which it applies (see order for details). [19-3137, 19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143] [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667039] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ryan Meyer, Mr. Stephen E. Robison, Mr. David G. Seely, and Mr. Gregory J. Stucky for Huff Landowner Group. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10667024] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/06/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3139] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667006] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] DGS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667001] Docketing statement filed by Huff Landowner Group. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] DGS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10667000] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen E. Robison, Gregory J. Stucky, David G. Seely and Ryan K. Meyer for Appellant Huff Landowner Group for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] --[Edited 07/30/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from the docket entry as the document has been filed.] DGS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666961] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Coldiron and Ms. Corey A. Neller for Northern Natural Gas Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666871] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark D. Coldiron; Corey A. Neller for Appellee Northern Natural Gas Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3139] --[Edited 07/30/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MC [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663446] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 07/30/2019 for Huff Landowner Group. Notice of appearance also due on 07/30/2019 for Northern Natural Gas Company [19-3139] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.