This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

Northern Natural Gas v. L.D. Drilling, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Northern Natural Gas filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against L D Drilling. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3137

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

HJB, INC.

LISA M. MILTON

WHITETAIL ENERGY, INC.

THE PEOPLES BANK

L.D. DRILLING, INC.

VISION INVESTMENTS OF PRATT, LLC

TAMMY MILTON

STEVEN EUGENE YOUNG

IVAN W. MILTON

NASH OIL & GAS, INC.

BILL R. MILTON

THE ESTATE OF L.D. DAVIS

KIM B. SHOEMAKER

TIMOTHY R. KEENAN

NANCY H. SHOEMAKER

Plaintiff / Appellee

NORTHERN NATURAL GAS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James M. Armstrong

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

Daniel J. Buller

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

Brian J. Madden

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Thomas A. Rottinghaus

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Adam S. Davis

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Scott A. Butcher

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

324 North Robinson Avenue, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

LeAnne Burnett

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

324 North Robinson Avenue, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

L. Mark Walker

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

324 North Robinson Avenue, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Harvey D. Ellis Jr.

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

324 North Robinson Avenue, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Rachael K. Pirner

Attorney at Triplett, Woolf & Garretson

2959 North Rock Road, Suite 300

Wichita, KS 67226

Neil C. Gosch

Attorney at Triplett, Woolf & Garretson

2959 North Rock Road, Suite 300

Wichita, KS 67226

Lisa L. Martin

Attorney at Triplett, Woolf & Garretson

2959 North Rock Road, Suite 300

Wichita, KS 67226

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paula Jantzen

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mark Coldiron

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Richard Allen Olmstead

Attorney at Kutak Rock

111 South Whittier, Suite 110

Wichita, KS 67207-1045

Corey A. Neller Esq.

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Corey A. Neller

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber

900 Robinson Renaissance, 119 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10666531] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Coldiron and Ms. Corey A. Neller, Esq. for Northern Natural Gas Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3137] [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

[10667357] Jurisdiction challenged. The appellant groups in each of these appeals shall file memorandum briefs addressing the finality of the orders on appeal due 08/14/19. Alternatively, any appellant group may voluntarily dismiss all or any portion of their respective appeal or elect not to file a response. Each appellant group shall caption their response only for their respective appeal and file it only in that appeal, unless two or more appellant groups elect to file a joint response, in which case the response should be captioned and filed in each appeal to which it applies (see order for details). [19-3137, 19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143] [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:37 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10665187] Entry of appearance filed by Adam S. Davis, Brian J. Madden and Thomas A. Rottinghaus for Nash Oil & Gas, Inc., The Peoples Bank and Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3137] [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

[10666491] Notice filed by appellants that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed. Served on: 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/29/2019 by MLB to correct docket text][19-3137] LMW [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:59 PM]

Open Document

[10670463] Motion filed by Appellants L.D. Drilling, Inc. and The Estate of L.D. Davis, Kim B. Shoemaker, Nancy H. Shoemaker, HJB, Inc., Timothy R. Keenan, Whitetail Energy, Inc., Bill R. Milton, Ivan W. Milton, Lisa M. Milton, Tammy Milton, Steven Eugene Young, Nash Oil & Gas Inc., Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC, and The Peoples Bank to dismiss case. Served on: 08/14/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3137] LB [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:11 AM]

Open Document

[10667689] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/01/2019. (Briefing on the merits is suspended.) [19-3137] [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

[10663474] Entry of appearance filed by James M. Armstrong and Daniel J. Buller for Mr. Bill R. Milton, HJB, Inc., Mr. Ivan W. Milton, Kim B. Shoemaker, Lisa M. Milton, Nancy H. Shoemaker, Mr. Steven Eugene Young, Ms. Tammy Milton, Mr. Timothy R. Keenan and Whitetail Energy, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3137] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document

[10666488] Joint docketing statement filed by Appellants. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137]--[Edited 07/29/2019 by DD to modify text] LMW [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:58 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10663260] Amended notice of appeal filed. [19-3137] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:23 PM]

Open Document

[10670637] Mandate issued. [19-3137] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:32 PM]

Open Document

[10666686] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Allen Olmstead for Northern Natural Gas Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:41 AM]

Open Document

[10670636] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. [19-3137] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:31 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670637] Mandate issued. [19-3137] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670636] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. [19-3137] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • [10670630] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' motion to dismiss case. Served on 08/14/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. See order for case termination to follow. [19-3137] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670463] Motion filed by Appellants L.D. Drilling, Inc. and The Estate of L.D. Davis, Kim B. Shoemaker, Nancy H. Shoemaker, HJB, Inc., Timothy R. Keenan, Whitetail Energy, Inc., Bill R. Milton, Ivan W. Milton, Lisa M. Milton, Tammy Milton, Steven Eugene Young, Nash Oil & Gas Inc., Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC, and The Peoples Bank to dismiss case. Served on: 08/14/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3137] LB [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667689] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/01/2019. (Briefing on the merits is suspended.) [19-3137] [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667357] Jurisdiction challenged. The appellant groups in each of these appeals shall file memorandum briefs addressing the finality of the orders on appeal due 08/14/19. Alternatively, any appellant group may voluntarily dismiss all or any portion of their respective appeal or elect not to file a response. Each appellant group shall caption their response only for their respective appeal and file it only in that appeal, unless two or more appellant groups elect to file a joint response, in which case the response should be captioned and filed in each appeal to which it applies (see order for details). [19-3137, 19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143] [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666686] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Allen Olmstead for Northern Natural Gas Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] [10666618] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard A. Olmstead for Appellee Northern Natural Gas Company in 19-3137, 19-3139, 19-3141, 19-3143 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KLP to delete from 19-337, 19-3141 and 19-3143 and to delete the attachment; entry filed.] RAO [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666531] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Coldiron and Ms. Corey A. Neller, Esq. for Northern Natural Gas Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3137] [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • [10666521] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark D. Coldiron and Corey A. Neller for Appellee Northern Natural Gas Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/29/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 7/29/19][19-3137] MC [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • [10666493] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/05/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSwi), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3137] [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666491] Notice filed by appellants that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed. Served on: 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/29/2019 by MLB to correct docket text][19-3137] LMW [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666488] Joint docketing statement filed by Appellants. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137]--[Edited 07/29/2019 by DD to modify text] LMW [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • [10666472] Entry of appearance submitted by L. Mark Walker, Harvey D. Ellis, LeAnne T. Burnett and Scott A. Butcher for Appellants L.D. Drilling, Inc. and The Estate of L.D. Davis for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/29/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 7/29/19][19-3137] LMW [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665187] Entry of appearance filed by Adam S. Davis, Brian J. Madden and Thomas A. Rottinghaus for Nash Oil & Gas, Inc., The Peoples Bank and Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3137] [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • [10665164] Entry of appearance submitted by Brian J. Madden, Thomas A. Rottinghaus, and Adam S. Davis for Appellants Nash Oil & Gas, Inc., Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC and The Peoples Bank for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137]--[Edited 07/23/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/23/19] BJM [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663474] Entry of appearance filed by James M. Armstrong and Daniel J. Buller for Mr. Bill R. Milton, HJB, Inc., Mr. Ivan W. Milton, Kim B. Shoemaker, Lisa M. Milton, Nancy H. Shoemaker, Mr. Steven Eugene Young, Ms. Tammy Milton, Mr. Timothy R. Keenan and Whitetail Energy, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3137] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • [10663358] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel J. Buller, James M. Armstrong for Appellants Kim B. Shoemaker, Nancy H. Shoemaker, HJB, Inc., Mr. Timothy R. Keenan, Whitetail Energy, Inc., Mr. Bill R. Milton, Mr. Ivan W. Milton, Lisa M. Milton, Ms. Tammy Milton and Mr. Steven Eugene Young for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3137] --[Edited 07/16/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/16/19] DJB [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663260] Amended notice of appeal filed. [19-3137] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663153] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/12/2019 Docketing statement due 07/29/2019 for HJB, Inc., Timothy R. Keenan, L.D. Drilling, Inc., Bill R. Milton, Ivan W. Milton, Lisa M. Milton, Tammy Milton, Nash Oil & Gas, Inc., Kim B. Shoemaker, Nancy H. Shoemaker, The Estate of L.D. Davis, The Peoples Bank, Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC, Whitetail Energy, Inc. and Steven Eugene Young. Transcript order form due 07/29/2019 for HJB, Inc., Timothy R. Keenan, L.D. Drilling, Inc., Bill R. Milton, Ivan W. Milton, Lisa M. Milton, Tammy Milton, Nash Oil & Gas, Inc., Kim B. Shoemaker, Nancy H. Shoemaker, The Estate of L.D. Davis, The Peoples Bank, Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC, Whitetail Energy, Inc. and Steven Eugene Young. Notice of appearance due on 07/29/2019 for HJB, Inc., Timothy R. Keenan, L.D. Drilling, Inc., Bill R. Milton, Ivan W. Milton, Lisa M. Milton, Tammy Milton, Nash Oil & Gas, Inc., Northern Natural Gas Company, Kim B. Shoemaker, Nancy H. Shoemaker, The Estate of L.D. Davis, The Peoples Bank, Vision Investments of Pratt, LLC, Whitetail Energy, Inc. and Steven Eugene Young. [19-3137] [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.