This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/01/2020 at 05:10:19 (UTC).

North Star Innovations, Inc. v. Micron Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 North Star Innovations, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1298

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

NORTH STAR INNOVATIONS, INC.

Appellee

MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Philip Levy

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor, Usx Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Appellee Attorney

Jeremy Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/23/2019. [659290] Entry of Appearance is due 01/13/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/13/2020. Docketing Statement is due 01/13/2020. Certified List is due on 02/10/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 12/30/2019 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH STAR INNOVATIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Jason Lang