This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/05/2019 at 06:06:16 (UTC).

North Canton Board of Ed v. AT&T, et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 North Canton Board of Ed filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AT T. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3740

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant

AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

NORTH CANTON BOARD OF EDUCATION, aka North Canton City School District Board of Education

Defendant / Appellees

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC

NCWPCS MPL 30-YEAR TOWER HOLDINGS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jacqueline B. Caldwell

Attorney at Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty

P.O. Box 36963

Canton, OH 44735

David Lance Dingwell

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

220 Market Avenue, S., Eighth Floor

Canton, OH 44702

James Matthew Williams

Attorney at Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty

P.O. Box 36963

Canton, OH 44735

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Seth H. Wamelink

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Katya Cronin

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Edward L. Bettendorf

Attorney at Ohio Bell Telephone Company

45 Erieview Plaza, Suite 1400

Cleveland, OH 44114-0000

John Q. Lewis

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Benjamin C. Sasse

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#1

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#12

13 #1

corporate disclosure

13 #2

Additional Document

#15

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Jacqueline B. Caldwell for North Canton Board of Education Certificate of Service:09/30/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-3740] (JBC) [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • (#14) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse for Appellees NCWPCS MPL 30-Year Tower Holdings, LLC and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC Certificate of Service: 08/20/2019. [19-3740] (BCS) [Entered: 08/20/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: Appellant brief due 09/30/2019. Appellee brief due 10/29/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • (#11) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Ms. Jacqueline B. Caldwell for North Canton Board of Education. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2019. [19-3740] (JBC) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant North Canton Board of Education by James M. Williams. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2019. [19-3740] (JMW) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Jacqueline B. Caldwell for Appellant North Canton Board of Education. Certificate of Service:08/19/2019. [19-3740] (JBC) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant North Canton Board of Education by Jacqueline Bollas Caldwell. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2019. [19-3740] (JBC) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant North Canton Board of Education by David L. Dingwell. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2019. [19-3740] (DLD) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees NCWPCS MPL 30-Year Tower Holdings, LLC and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC by John Q. Lewis. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2019. [19-3740] (JQL) [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and NCWPCS MPL 30-Year Tower Holdings, LLC by Benjamin C. Sasse'. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2019. [19-3740] (BCS) [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant North Canton Board of Education. Hearings held: y. (BLC) [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH is a litigant

Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth H. Wamelink

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin C. Sasse