Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 06:02:38 (UTC).

Nohelia Castillo v. Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Nohelia Castillo filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Joann Urquhart, M D , P C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2227

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOANN URQUHART, M.D., P.C.

JOANN URQUHART

Plaintiff / Appellant

NOHELIA M. CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James Douglas Baldridge

Attorney at VENABLE, LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Courtney Ann Sullivan

Attorney at VENABLE, LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs

Attorney at VENABLE, LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Courtney A. Sullivan

Attorney at VENABLE, LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Kingston Amster

Attorney at ZIPIN, AMSTER & GREENBERG, LLC

8757 Georgia Avenue

Silver Spring, MD 20910

Anthony George Bizien

Attorney at ZIPIN, AMSTER & GREENBERG, LLC

8757 Georgia Avenue

Silver Spring, MD 20910

Philip B. Zipin

Attorney at ZIPIN, AMSTER & GREENBERG, LLC

8757 Georgia Avenue

Silver Spring, MD 20910

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] Number of days granted: 28. Opening brief and appendix due 01/27/2020. Response brief due 02/26/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000642649] [19-2227] EB [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:00 AM]

#13

(#13) CONSENT/STIPULATION by Nohelia M. Castillo to extend filing time for Undersigned counsel Anthony G. Bizien and his wife are expecting their first child in late December 2019. Mr. Bizien will be the individual primarily responsible for preparing Appellant's brief. until Appellant respectfully requests a four-week extension of the briefing schedule.. [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:31 PM]

#12

(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2227] LHP [Entered: 11/20/2019 11:12 AM]

#11

(#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/30/2019. Response Brief due 01/29/2020. [19-2227] EB [Entered: 11/19/2019 08:55 AM]

#10

(#10) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Nohelia M. Castillo. [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:16 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Nohelia M. Castillo. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628292] [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:15 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip Zipin for Nohelia M. Castillo. [1000628290] [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:14 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael K. Amster for Nohelia M. Castillo. [1000628289] [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:12 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628091] [19-2227] Robin Burroughs [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:08 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robin S. Burroughs for Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. [1000627926] [19-2227] Robin Burroughs [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:38 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. [1000627780] [19-2227] Courtney Sullivan [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:22 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Douglas Baldridge for Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. [1000627740] [19-2227] James Baldridge [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:55 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01810-PX. Mailed to: Anthony George Bizien; Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs; Courtney Ann Sullivan; Philip B. Zipin. [19-2227] EB [Entered: 11/04/2019 03:17 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01810-PX. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-2227] EB [Entered: 11/04/2019 03:10 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] Number of days granted: 28. Opening brief and appendix due 01/27/2020. Response brief due 02/26/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000642649] [19-2227] EB [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT/STIPULATION by Nohelia M. Castillo to extend filing time for Undersigned counsel Anthony G. Bizien and his wife are expecting their first child in late December 2019. Mr. Bizien will be the individual primarily responsible for preparing Appellant's brief. until Appellant respectfully requests a four-week extension of the briefing schedule.. [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2227] LHP [Entered: 11/20/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/30/2019. Response Brief due 01/29/2020. [19-2227] EB [Entered: 11/19/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Nohelia M. Castillo. [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Nohelia M. Castillo. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628292] [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip Zipin for Nohelia M. Castillo. [1000628290] [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael K. Amster for Nohelia M. Castillo. [1000628289] [19-2227] Michael Amster [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628091] [19-2227] Robin Burroughs [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robin S. Burroughs for Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. [1000627926] [19-2227] Robin Burroughs [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. [1000627780] [19-2227] Courtney Sullivan [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Douglas Baldridge for Joann Urquhart, M.D., P.C. and Joann Urquhart. [1000627740] [19-2227] James Baldridge [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01810-PX. Mailed to: Anthony George Bizien; Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs; Courtney Ann Sullivan; Philip B. Zipin. [19-2227] EB [Entered: 11/04/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-01810-PX. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-2227] EB [Entered: 11/04/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip B. Zipin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony George Bizien

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Kingston Amster