This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/28/2022 at 06:20:59 (UTC).

Noel Stephens v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Im, et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Noel Stephens filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U S Im. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-11451

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NOEL RICARDO STEPHENS

Respondents

FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, MIAMI FIELD OFFICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

ACTING DIRECTOR OF U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Felix Montanez

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3750

Miami, FL 33131

Rose Murray

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

Po Box 57089

New Orleans, LA 70157

Respondent Attorneys

Jason Wisecup

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

450 5Th St, Nw Rm 2043

Washington, DC 20001

Natalie Diaz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

11200 Nw 20 St

Miami, FL 33176

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Restricted Document #2

Order on Report and Recommendations doc#22

Open Restricted Document #3

Report and Recommendation doc#19

Open Restricted Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ORDER: Pursuant to Appellants Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States and Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 06/03/2022 02:30 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Pursuant to Appellants Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States and Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 06/03/2022 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Attorney General of the United States is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9682109-2 ], ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Attorney General of the United States is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9681141-2 ] [Entered: 06/03/2022 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [9682109-1] [22-11451] (ECF: Jason Wisecup) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [9681141-1] [22-11451] (ECF: Jason Wisecup) [Entered: 05/30/2022 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason Wisecup for Appellants Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11451] (ECF: Jason Wisecup) [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jason Wisecup for Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Attorney General of the United States. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jason Wisecup for Appellants Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [22-11451] (ECF: Jason Wisecup) [Entered: 05/13/2022 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Wisecup for Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. [22-11451] (ECF: Jason Wisecup) [Entered: 05/04/2022 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of efiling deficiency- Jason Wisecup: You must list all parties that you represent on the appearance of counsel form. [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Wisecup for Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. [22-11451] (ECF: Jason Wisecup) [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 04/29/2022 Appellant brief due 40 days from 04/29/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie Diaz