This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 06:04:26 (UTC).

Noel Rojas v. Delta Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Noel Rojas filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Delta Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1480

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DELTA AIRLINES, INCORPORATED

ABC AEROLINEAS, S.A. DE C.V.

SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.

AEROENLACES NACIONALES, S.A. DE C.V.

UNITED AIRLINES, INCORPORATED

AEROVIAS DE MEXICO S.A. DE C.V.

AMERICAN AIRLINES, INCORPORATED

JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellants

PATRICIO MERCADO

NOEL MORAN ROJAS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

MIGUEL HILARION JIMENEZ

LUZMARIA ARMENDAIZ DE ARROYO

TERESA ESTRADA-JIMENEZ

OLIVIA ISABEL GONZALES

MAYRA LUISA CASTILLO CASTENEDA

ALEXANDRA ALMANZA

RUBEN ALFONSO ARROYO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Solesse Lane Altman

Attorney at BONDURANT, MIXSON & ELMORE

3900 Ibm Tower, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-4501

Frank M. Lowrey IV

Attorney at BONDURANT, MIXSON & ELMORE

3900 Ibm Tower, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-4501

Christy Michelle Milliken

Attorney at STINSON LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Roy Goldberg

Attorney at STINSON LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

J. Mark Gidley

Attorney at WHITE & CASE, LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Jaclyn Ilene Phillips

Attorney at WHITE & CASE, LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Eli Joseph Litoff

Attorney at RILEY SAFER HOLMES & CANCILA LLP

3 1St National Plaza, 70 West Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Jared A. Wilkerson

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Raechel Keay Kummer

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1 Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Anna M. Rathbun

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

600 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Daniel M. Wall

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

505 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sadik Huseny

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

505 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Molly M. Barron

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen W. Abbott

Attorney at PREBEG, FAUCETT & ABBOTT, PLCC

8441 Gulf Freeway

Houston, TX 77017

Christopher Faucett

Attorney at PREBEG, FAUCETT & ABBOTT, PLCC

8441 Gulf Freeway

Houston, TX 77017

Nicholas A. Morrow

Attorney at MORROW & SHEPPARD LLP

3701 Kirby Drive

Houston, TX 77098

Matthew J.M. Prebeg

Attorney at PREBEG, FAUCETT & ABBOTT, PLCC

8441 Gulf Freeway

Houston, TX 77017

Tejinder Singh

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN & RUSSELL, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Avenue

Bethesda, MD 20814

Jason H. Kim

Attorney at SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL KONECKY LLP

2000 Powell Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

Brent T. Caldwell

Attorney at PREBEG, FAUCETT & ABBOTT, PLCC

8441 Gulf Freeway

Houston, TX 77017

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 45 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 07/22/2020. Response brief due 08/21/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000757672] [20-1480] CB [Entered: 06/16/2020 08:17 AM]

#45

(#45) MOTION by Noel Moran Rojas, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Olivia Isabel Gonzales, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Patricio Mercado, Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo and Miguel Hilarion Jimenez to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until July 22, 2020.. Date and method of service: 06/15/2020 ecf. [1000757460] [20-1480] Eric Citron [Entered: 06/15/2020 04:53 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1480] MRB [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:07 AM]

#44

(#44) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. for Aerovias De Mexico S.A. De C.V.. [1000742329] [20-1480] J. Cooney [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:00 AM]

#43

(#43) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher M. Faucett for Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Olivia Isabel Gonzales, Miguel Hilarion Jimenez, Patricio Mercado and Noel Moran Rojas. [1000742305] [20-1480] Brent Caldwell [Entered: 05/20/2020 10:31 AM]

#42

(#42) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew John Prebeg for Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Olivia Isabel Gonzales, Miguel Hilarion Jimenez, Patricio Mercado and Noel Moran Rojas. [1000742303] [20-1480] Brent Caldwell [Entered: 05/20/2020 10:29 AM]

#41

(#41) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brent Taylor Caldwell for Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Miguel Hilarion Jimenez, Patricio Mercado, Noel Moran Rojas and Olivia Isabel Gonzales. [1000741054] [20-1480] Brent Caldwell [Entered: 05/18/2020 07:10 PM]

#40

(#40) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by American Airlines, Incorporated. [20-1480] Sadik Huseny [Entered: 05/18/2020 06:08 PM]

#39

(#39) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Aeroenlaces Nacionales, S.A. De C.V.. [20-1480] Noah Brumfield [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:26 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delta Airlines, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000731419] [20-1480] Frank Lowrey [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:32 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Frank M. Lowrey, IV for Delta Airlines, Incorporated. [1000731415] [20-1480] Frank Lowrey [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:31 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christy M. Milliken for ABC Aerolineas, S.A. De C.V., JetBlue Airways Corporation and Southwest Airlines Co.. [1000729695] [20-1480] Christy Milliken [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:13 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines Co.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000729685] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:10 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JetBlue Airways Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000729679] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:08 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABC Aerolineas, S.A. De C.V.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000729677] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:07 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Roy Goldberg for ABC Aerolineas, S.A. De C.V., JetBlue Airways Corporation and Southwest Airlines Co.. [1000729672] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:04 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-00665-GJH. Mailed to: Stephen Abbott, Brent Caldwell, Christopher Faucett, Jason Kim, Nicholas Morrow, Matthew Prebeg, John Sheppard, Solesse Altman, Frank Lowrey, IV, Sondra Hemeryck, Patricia Holmes, Molly Barron, Anna Rathbun, Daniel Wall, J. Gordon Cooney, Humburto Gonzalez, Raechel Kummer, Jared Wilkerson, Brandon Nagy, Noah Brumfield, J. Mark Gidley, Jaclyn Phillips, Tracey Ohm. [20-1480] CB [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:47 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-00665-GJH. Mailed to: Stephen Abbott, Brent Caldwell, Christopher Faucett, Jason Kim, Nicholas Morrow, Matthew Prebeg, John Sheppard, Solesse Altman, Frank Lowrey, IV, Sondra Hemeryck, Patricia Holmes, Molly Barron, Anna Rathbun, Daniel Wall, J. Gordon Cooney, Humburto Gonzalez, Raechel Kummer, Jared Wilkerson, Brandon Nagy, Noah Brumfield, J. Mark Gidley, Jaclyn Phillips, Tracey Ohm. [20-1480] CB [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:47 PM]

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 45 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 07/22/2020. Response brief due 08/21/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000757672] [20-1480] CB [Entered: 06/16/2020 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION by Noel Moran Rojas, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Olivia Isabel Gonzales, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Patricio Mercado, Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo and Miguel Hilarion Jimenez to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until July 22, 2020.. Date and method of service: 06/15/2020 ecf. [1000757460] [20-1480] Eric Citron [Entered: 06/15/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1480] MRB [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. for Aerovias De Mexico S.A. De C.V.. [1000742329] [20-1480] J. Cooney [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher M. Faucett for Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Olivia Isabel Gonzales, Miguel Hilarion Jimenez, Patricio Mercado and Noel Moran Rojas. [1000742305] [20-1480] Brent Caldwell [Entered: 05/20/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew John Prebeg for Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Olivia Isabel Gonzales, Miguel Hilarion Jimenez, Patricio Mercado and Noel Moran Rojas. [1000742303] [20-1480] Brent Caldwell [Entered: 05/20/2020 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brent Taylor Caldwell for Alexandra Almanza, Ruben Alfonso Arroyo, Mayra Luisa Castillo Casteneda, Luzmaria Armendaiz De Arroyo, Teresa Estrada-Jimenez, Miguel Hilarion Jimenez, Patricio Mercado, Noel Moran Rojas and Olivia Isabel Gonzales. [1000741054] [20-1480] Brent Caldwell [Entered: 05/18/2020 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by American Airlines, Incorporated. [20-1480] Sadik Huseny [Entered: 05/18/2020 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Aeroenlaces Nacionales, S.A. De C.V.. [20-1480] Noah Brumfield [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Aerovias De Mexico S.A. De C.V.. [20-1480] Raechel Kummer [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Solesse L. Altman for Delta Airlines, Incorporated. [1000731421] [20-1480] Solesse Altman [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delta Airlines, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000731419] [20-1480] Frank Lowrey [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Frank M. Lowrey, IV for Delta Airlines, Incorporated. [1000731415] [20-1480] Frank Lowrey [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christy M. Milliken for ABC Aerolineas, S.A. De C.V., JetBlue Airways Corporation and Southwest Airlines Co.. [1000729695] [20-1480] Christy Milliken [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines Co.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000729685] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JetBlue Airways Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000729679] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABC Aerolineas, S.A. De C.V.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000729677] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Roy Goldberg for ABC Aerolineas, S.A. De C.V., JetBlue Airways Corporation and Southwest Airlines Co.. [1000729672] [20-1480] Roy Goldberg [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-00665-GJH. Mailed to: Stephen Abbott, Brent Caldwell, Christopher Faucett, Jason Kim, Nicholas Morrow, Matthew Prebeg, John Sheppard, Solesse Altman, Frank Lowrey, IV, Sondra Hemeryck, Patricia Holmes, Molly Barron, Anna Rathbun, Daniel Wall, J. Gordon Cooney, Humburto Gonzalez, Raechel Kummer, Jared Wilkerson, Brandon Nagy, Noah Brumfield, J. Mark Gidley, Jaclyn Phillips, Tracey Ohm. [20-1480] CB [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-00665-GJH. Case manager: CBennett. [20-1480] CB [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JetBlue Airways Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant