This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2019 at 09:32:43 (UTC).

Nobles v. Fischer

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Nobles filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Fischer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-717

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Martin Nobles

Staten Island, NY 10301

Defendant / Appellees

Terrance X. Tracy, in his individual capacity and the capacity as Chief Counsel for the Division of Parole

Brian S. Fischer, individually and in his capacity as Commissioner of the New York State Department of Correctional Service

Anthony Annucci, individually and in his capacity as Deputy Commissioner and Counsel for the Department of Corrections and Community Supervision

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Martin Nobles

316 York Avenue

Staten Island, NY 10301

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David Lawrence III

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2560510] [19-717] [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:29 PM]

#16

(#16) ORDER, dated 04/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2019, unless Appellant Martin Nobles, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2537373] [19-717] [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:29 PM]

#15

(#15) ORDER, dated 04/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2019, unless Appellant Martin Nobles, submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2537371] [19-717] [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:23 PM]

11 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

11 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

9 #2

Supporting Document

9 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2524599] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:31 AM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/13/2018, RECEIVED.[2524589] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:26 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/08/2018, RECEIVED.[2524588] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:25 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER, [ # 15 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Martin Nobles failure to file form D-P, EFFECTIVE. [2560516] [19-717] [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2560510] [19-717] [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER, dated 04/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2019, unless Appellant Martin Nobles, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2537373] [19-717] [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER, dated 04/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2019, unless Appellant Martin Nobles, submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2537371] [19-717] [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2525501] [19-717] [Entered: 03/26/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2525103] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Annucci, Terrance X. Tracy, Brian S. Fischer and Appellant Martin Nobles, FILED. Service date 03/25/2019 by US mail. [2525040] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2524599] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2524592] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/13/2018, RECEIVED.[2524589] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/08/2018, RECEIVED.[2524588] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Martin Nobles, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2524577] [19-717] [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less