This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/10/2022 at 06:05:07 (UTC).

Noah Saeedy v. The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Noah Saeedy filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55667

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NOAH SAEEDY

Defendant / Appellee

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jay T. Jambeck

Attorney at Leigh Law Group, P.C.

870 Market Street, Suite 1157

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Erika Lynn Shao

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

633 W 5Th Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #3

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Noah Saeedy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/20/2022. [12498125] [22-55667] (Jambeck, Jay) [Entered: 07/20/2022 10:58 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/22/2022, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12500157] (VS) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:21 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 09/14/2022, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12531544] (VS) [Entered: 09/01/2022 10:45 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 09/14/2022, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12531544] (VS) [Entered: 09/01/2022 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/22/2022, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12500157] (VS) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/20/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12498295]. [22-55667] (AD) [Entered: 07/20/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Noah Saeedy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/20/2022. [12498125] [22-55667] (Jambeck, Jay) [Entered: 07/20/2022 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Noah Saeedy Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/19/2022. Appellant Noah Saeedy opening brief due 09/12/2022. Appellee The Regents of the University of California answering brief due 10/11/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12492131] (JMR) [Entered: 07/12/2022 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erika Lynn Shao