This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 11:59:12 (UTC).

NNOC, etc. v. Midwest Division-RMC, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 NNOC, etc filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2200

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United

Defendant / Appellant

Midwest Division-RMC, LLC, doing business as Research Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Quinlan Braden Moll

Attorney at BLAKE & UHLIG

Suite 475, New Brotherhood Building, 753 State Avenue

Kansas City, KS 66101-0000

Micah L. Berul

Attorney at NATIONAL NURSES UNITED

155 Grand Avenue

Oakland, CA 94612

Jason R. McClitis

Attorney at BLAKE & UHLIG

Suite 475, New Brotherhood Building, 753 State Avenue

Kansas City, KS 66101-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew B. Banocy

Attorney at FORD & HARRISON

Suite 1710, 7777 Bonhomme Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Corey L. Franklin

Attorney at FORD & HARRISON

Suite 1710, 7777 Bonhomme Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5053938-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Corey L. Franklin. Brief of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC due 08/09/2021. Appendix due on 08/09/2021. [5054082] [21-2200] (NDG) [Entered: 07/13/2021 09:37 AM]

Open Document #2

Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief - Affidavit of M. Banocy

Open Document #1

Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Mathew Banocy for Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC w/service 07/12/2021 [5053901] [21-2200] (MBB) [Entered: 07/12/2021 03:19 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC - w/service 06/11/2021. [5044619] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/11/2021 06:00 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. w/service 06/11/2021 [5044618] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/11/2021 05:58 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/11/2021 [5044615] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/11/2021 05:47 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Micah L. Berul for Appellee National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United w/service 06/08/2021 [5043363] [21-2200] (MLB) [Entered: 06/08/2021 05:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jason R. McClitis for Appellee National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United w/service 06/08/2021 [5043177] [21-2200] (JRM) [Entered: 06/08/2021 12:04 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. Transcript ordered[5042165] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:13 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. - FOR CAL [5042162] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Corey L. Franklin for Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC w/service 06/04/2021 [5042158] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:10 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. - FOR CAL [5041702] [21-2200] (MLB) [Entered: 06/03/2021 11:36 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/07/2021. Appendix due 07/19/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Midwest Division-RMC, LLC due 07/19/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040236] [21-2200] (CAH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:19 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 4/28/21, judgment 4/28/21. [5040227] [21-2200] (CAH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:15 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5040224] [21-2200] (CAH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:12 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5053938-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Corey L. Franklin. Brief of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC due 08/09/2021. Appendix due on 08/09/2021. [5054082] [21-2200] (NDG) [Entered: 07/13/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/09/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Corey L. Franklin for Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC w/service 07/12/2021. [5053938] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 07/12/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mathew Banocy for Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC w/service 07/12/2021 [5053901] [21-2200] (MBB) [Entered: 07/12/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Oral Arguments - District Court document #48 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / WMKC, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/27/2021, No. of Pgs.: 37, Court Reporter: Wambolt, Gayle [5046892] [21-2200] (STL) [Entered: 06/21/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC - w/service 06/11/2021. [5044619] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/11/2021 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. w/service 06/11/2021 [5044618] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/11/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/11/2021 [5044615] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/11/2021 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Micah L. Berul for Appellee National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United w/service 06/08/2021 [5043363] [21-2200] (MLB) [Entered: 06/08/2021 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jason R. McClitis for Appellee National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United w/service 06/08/2021 [5043177] [21-2200] (JRM) [Entered: 06/08/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. Transcript ordered[5042165] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. - FOR CAL [5042162] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Corey L. Franklin for Appellant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC w/service 06/04/2021 [5042158] [21-2200] (CLF) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. - FOR CAL [5041702] [21-2200] (MLB) [Entered: 06/03/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/07/2021. Appendix due 07/19/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Midwest Division-RMC, LLC due 07/19/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040236] [21-2200] (CAH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 4/28/21, judgment 4/28/21. [5040227] [21-2200] (CAH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5040224] [21-2200] (CAH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midwest Division - RMC, LLC doing business as Research Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Brian Banocy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corey Louis Franklin