This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 05:25:07 (UTC).

NLRB v. SW Design School, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 NLRB filed an Other lawsuit against SW Design School, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1987

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

Respondents

SW DESIGN SCHOOL, LLC, d/b/a INTERNS4HIRE.COM

K-12 CODERS

SW DESIGN SCHOOL, L3C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ruth E. Burdick

Attorney at NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Jared David Cantor

Attorney at NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Sean R. Marshall

Attorney at NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

Region 5, Tower Ii, 100 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Kira Dellinger Vol

Attorney at NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Respondent Attorney

Tarsha Weary

833 Kennedy Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20011

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE ISSUED to K-12 Coders, SW Design School, L3C and SW Design School, LLC re: status of counsel. Mailed to: Tarsha Weary obo respondents at the following addresses: 201 Ritchie Road Capitol Heights, MD 20743, 26677 W. 12 Mile Road Southfield, MI 48034, 1901 Mississippi Avenue, S.E. Suite 103 Washington, DC 20020, 733 Euclid Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20001, 83. Status of Counsel due 09/20/2021. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/10/2021 03:19 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jared D. Cantor for NLRB. [1001020380] [21-1987] Jared Cantor [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:30 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kira Dellinger Vol for NLRB. [1001020376] [21-1987] Kira Vol [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:27 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ruth E. Burdick for NLRB. [1001020354] [21-1987] Ruth Burdick [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:12 PM]

#4

(#4) NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from NLRB. Date petition for review or application filed: 09/09/2021. [ # 2 ] Motion for enforcement of agency order. Mailed to: Matthew Hyson (Charging Party), Sean Marshall (Regional Director), Tarsha Weary (Respondents' Counsel). Administrative Record due 10/19/2021 [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:22 AM]

#3

(#3) RULE 15 NOTICE ISSUED to K-12 Coders, SW Design School, L3C and SW Design School, LLC requesting response to the [ # 2 ] Motion for enforcement of agency orderResponse due 09/30/2021.[1001020026]. Mailed to: Sean Marshall, Regional Director; Tarsha Weary. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:14 AM]

2 #3

Agency order

#2

Application for enforcement of agency order

2 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 05-CA-243576. Case manager: AWalker. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:09 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#10) Document(s) re-sent to K-12 Coders and SW Design School, L3C. Which document(s)? notice re: status of counsel, notice serving respondents, application for enforcement.. Mailed to: Tarsha Weary obo respondents 833 Kennedy Street NW Washington DC 20011. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/15/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE ISSUED to K-12 Coders, SW Design School, L3C and SW Design School, LLC re: status of counsel. Mailed to: Tarsha Weary obo respondents at the following addresses: 201 Ritchie Road Capitol Heights, MD 20743, 26677 W. 12 Mile Road Southfield, MI 48034, 1901 Mississippi Avenue, S.E. Suite 103 Washington, DC 20020, 733 Euclid Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20001, 83. Status of Counsel due 09/20/2021. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/10/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jared D. Cantor for NLRB. [1001020380] [21-1987] Jared Cantor [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kira Dellinger Vol for NLRB. [1001020376] [21-1987] Kira Vol [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ruth E. Burdick for NLRB. [1001020354] [21-1987] Ruth Burdick [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from NLRB. Date petition for review or application filed: 09/09/2021. [ # 2 ] Motion for enforcement of agency order. Mailed to: Matthew Hyson (Charging Party), Sean Marshall (Regional Director), Tarsha Weary (Respondents' Counsel). Administrative Record due 10/19/2021 [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 15 NOTICE ISSUED to K-12 Coders, SW Design School, L3C and SW Design School, LLC requesting response to the [ # 2 ] Motion for enforcement of agency orderResponse due 09/30/2021.[1001020026]. Mailed to: Sean Marshall, Regional Director; Tarsha Weary. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application for enforcement of agency order filed by NLRB.[1001020024] [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 05-CA-243576. Case manager: AWalker. [21-1987] AW [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant