This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2021 at 19:46:15 (UTC).

NLRB v. Keck Hospital of USC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2012 NLRB filed an Other lawsuit against Keck Hospital of USC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    12-1467

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

National Labor Relations Board

Respondents

Keck Hospital of USC, formerly known as USC University Hospital

Sodexo America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Heather Stacy Beard Esquire

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Ruth E. Burdick

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Linda Dreeben

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Respondent Attorneys

Desmond Terrell McIlwain Esquire

Attorney at Tobin, O'Connor & Ewing

5335 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20015

Mark Thomas Bennett Esquire

Attorney at Marks Finch Thornton & Baird, LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92121-3107

Stephen John Schultz

Attorney at Marks Golia & Finch LLP

8620 Spectrum Center Boulevard, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92123-1454

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1505587] that the motion to remand [ # 1500259-2 ] be granted. The decision of the National Labor Relations Board is vacated and the case remanded to the Board for further proceedings. See NLRB v. Noel Canning, 134 S. Ct. 2550 (2014). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-application for enforcement be dismissed as moot. Before Judges: Brown, Pillard and Wilkins. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 08/01/2014 12:35 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1500259] by NLRB in 12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467 to remand case [Service Date: 07/01/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] (Dreeben, Linda) [Entered: 07/01/2014 02:39 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER filed [1417309] dismissing as moot motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1405341-2 ]; holding case in abeyance. Cases 12-1413,12-1426,12-1467 held in abeyance pending further order of the court. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 01/25/2013 04:16 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE FILED [1410860] by Keck Hospital of USC in 12-1467 to Application for Enforcement [Service Date: 12/18/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] (McIlwain, Desmond) [Entered: 12/18/2012 05:18 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE FILED [1410846] by Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426 to Application for Enforcement [ # 1407139-2 ] [Service Date: 12/18/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Pages: 1-10. [12-1426, 12-1413, 12-1467] (Bennett, Mark) [Entered: 12/18/2012 04:34 PM]

Open Document

JOINT REPLY FILED [1410018] by Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426 to response [ # 1408672-2 ], [ # 1407466-2 ] [Service Date: 12/13/2012 by Email, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1426, 12-1413, 12-1467] (Bennett, Mark) [Entered: 12/13/2012 04:07 PM]

Open Document

JOINT REPLY FILED [1408672] by Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426 to response [ # 1407466-2 ] [Service Date: 12/06/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Pages: 1-10. [12-1426, 12-1413, 12-1467] (Bennett, Mark) [Entered: 12/06/2012 01:51 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1407466] by NLRB in 12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1405341-2 ] [Service Date: 11/29/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] (Dreeben, Linda) [Entered: 11/29/2012 04:12 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1407144] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1407139-2 ] [12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 03:04 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER filed [1407142] consolidating cases 12-1467 (Consolidation started 11/28/2012) with 12-1413 [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 03:01 PM]

Open Document

CROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT filed [1407139] by NLRB of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 11/28/2012 ] [12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 02:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2014
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED to NLRB [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 08/01/2014 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER filed [1505587] that the motion to remand [ # 1500259-2 ] be granted. The decision of the National Labor Relations Board is vacated and the case remanded to the Board for further proceedings. See NLRB v. Noel Canning, 134 S. Ct. 2550 (2014). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-application for enforcement be dismissed as moot. Before Judges: Brown, Pillard and Wilkins. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 08/01/2014 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1500259] by NLRB in 12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467 to remand case [Service Date: 07/01/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] (Dreeben, Linda) [Entered: 07/01/2014 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER filed [1417309] dismissing as moot motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1405341-2 ]; holding case in abeyance. Cases 12-1413,12-1426,12-1467 held in abeyance pending further order of the court. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 01/25/2013 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED [1410860] by Keck Hospital of USC in 12-1467 to Application for Enforcement [Service Date: 12/18/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] (McIlwain, Desmond) [Entered: 12/18/2012 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED [1410846] by Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426 to Application for Enforcement [ # 1407139-2 ] [Service Date: 12/18/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Pages: 1-10. [12-1426, 12-1413, 12-1467] (Bennett, Mark) [Entered: 12/18/2012 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT REPLY FILED [1410018] by Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426 to response [ # 1408672-2 ], [ # 1407466-2 ] [Service Date: 12/13/2012 by Email, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1426, 12-1413, 12-1467] (Bennett, Mark) [Entered: 12/13/2012 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketFIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1409728] marked "Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. Stephen John Schultz for Petitioner Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426, Attorney Mr. Stephen John Schultz for Respondent Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1467. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 12/12/2012 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT REPLY FILED [1408672] by Sodexo America, LLC in 12-1426 to response [ # 1407466-2 ] [Service Date: 12/06/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Pages: 1-10. [12-1426, 12-1413, 12-1467] (Bennett, Mark) [Entered: 12/06/2012 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1407466] by NLRB in 12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1405341-2 ] [Service Date: 11/29/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] (Dreeben, Linda) [Entered: 11/29/2012 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1407144] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1407139-2 ] [12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER filed [1407142] consolidating cases 12-1467 (Consolidation started 11/28/2012) with 12-1413 [12-1413, 12-1426, 12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT filed [1407139] by NLRB of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 11/28/2012 ] [12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketCROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT CASE docketed. [12-1467] [Entered: 11/28/2012 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SODEXO AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant