This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2021 at 05:21:12 (UTC).

NLRB v. BS&B Safety Systems

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 NLRB filed an Other lawsuit against BS B Safety Systems. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-9536

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

Respondent

BS&B SAFETY SYSTEMS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Elizabeth Ann Heaney Esq.

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1099 14Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20570

Ruth E. Burdick

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street Se

Washington, DC 20003

Stephanie M. Berger

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street Se

Washington, DC 20003

Respondent Attorneys

R. Mark Solano

400 South Muskogee Avenue

Claremore, OK 74017

Kevin Y. Litz

5437 East 110Th Street

Tulsa, OK 74145

Charles Hart

Attorney at BS&B Safety Systems

7422 East 46Th Street

Tulsa, OK 74145-6306

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10821993] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Ruth E. Burdick for NLRB. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-9536] [Entered: 04/13/2021 12:58 PM]

Open Document

[10821989] Entry of appearance filed by Stephanie M Berger and Ms. Elizabeth Ann Heaney, Esq. for NLRB. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-9536] [Entered: 04/13/2021 12:27 PM]

Open Document #2

Applic. for Enforc. Docket Letter

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10821993] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Ruth E. Burdick for NLRB. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-9536] [Entered: 04/13/2021 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10821989] Entry of appearance filed by Stephanie M Berger and Ms. Elizabeth Ann Heaney, Esq. for NLRB. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-9536] [Entered: 04/13/2021 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket[10821972] Entry of appearance submitted by Ruth E. Burdick for Petitioner NLRB for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/13/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-9536] REB [Entered: 04/13/2021 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket[10821964] Entry of appearance submitted by Ruth E. Burdick for Petitioner NLRB for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-9536] --[Edited 04/13/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 4/13/2021.] REB [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10821894] Application for enforcement filed. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. Copy served on party at address shown in 04/13/2021 letter. Docketing statement and notice of appearance due 04/27/2021 for National Labor Relations Board. Notice of appearance due on 04/27/2021 for BS&B Safety Systems. Answer due 05/04/2021 for BS&B Safety Systems. Agency record due 05/24/2021 for National Labor Relations Board. [21-9536] [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant