This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:52:09 (UTC).

Nieves-Cruz v. US

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Nieves-Cruz filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1005

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

BERLAY NIEVES CRUZ

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Eleonora Concepcion Marranzini

Attorney at Federal Public Defender Office

241 F.D. Roosevelt Ave, 4Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-2441

Eric A. Vos

Attorney at Federal Public Defender Office

241 F.D. Roosevelt Ave, 4Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-2441

Vivianne Marie Marrero-Torres

Attorney at Federal Public Defender Office

241 F.D. Roosevelt Ave, 4Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-2441

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to request certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 03/11/2019. [19-1005] (GK) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz. Certificate of service dated 02/08/2019. [19-1005] (VMM) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:51 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2019. [19-1005] (VMM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:19 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz filed by Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero Torres. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2019. [19-1005] (VMM) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:23 AM]

Open Document

ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 02/08/2019. Date of denial by district court: October 16, 2018. [19-1005] (CP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to request certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 03/11/2019. [19-1005] (GK) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz. Certificate of service dated 02/08/2019. [19-1005] (VMM) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2019. [19-1005] (VMM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Berlay Nieves Cruz filed by Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero Torres. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2019. [19-1005] (VMM) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 02/08/2019. Date of denial by district court: October 16, 2018. [19-1005] (CP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #22) filed by Appellant Berlay Nieves-Cruz. Docketing Statement due 01/18/2019. Appearance form due 01/18/2019. [19-1005] (CP) [Entered: 01/04/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less