This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/06/2021 at 06:31:32 (UTC).

Nieves Acevedo, et al v. CPC Carolina PR, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Nieves Acevedo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CPC Carolina PR, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1795

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendant / Appellees

CPC CAROLINA PR, LLC

EDWARD NIEVES-ROMAN

MARIA TERESA CRUZ MARRERO

RAMON FERNANDEZ CRUZ

EDGARDO JOSE FERNANDEZ CRUZ

LISA FERNANDEZ CRUZ

FRANCISCO JAVIER FERNANDEZ CRUZ

WANDA IVELISSE FERNANDEZ CRUZ

KHADIJAH AHMAD HAMDALLAH

JAVIER FRANCISCO FERNANDEZ CRUZ

PUERTO RICO CVS PHARMACY, LLC

CVS PHARMACY, INC.

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

CVS PHARMACY, INC.

KRB INVESTMENTS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellants

RICARDO NIEVES-ACEVEDO

JANET MARIE VEGA-RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose Luis Novas-Debien III

Attorney at Jose Luis Novas Law Offices

Pmb 382400 Calaf St

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou

Urb. Dorado Del Marvillas De Golf 70

Dorado, PR 00646

Jose Luis Ramirez-Coll

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde

Po Box 194000

San Juan, PR 00919

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Jo Canamero

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Bricknell Aveste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Jesus E. Cuza Abdala

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Bricknell Aveste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz

Attorney at Cancio Nadal & Rivera, LLC

Po Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina

Attorney at Cancio Nadal & Rivera, LLC

Po Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Plaintiff and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou

Urb. Dorado Del Marvillas De Golf 70

Dorado, PR 00646

Jose Luis Ramirez-Coll

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Teichka Rodriguez- Munoz

Attorney at AMRC, LLC

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Rebecca Jo Canamero

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Bricknell Aveste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Jesus E. Cuza Abdala

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Bricknell Aveste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz

Attorney at Cancio Nadal & Rivera, LLC

Po Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina

Attorney at Cancio Nadal & Rivera, LLC

Po Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee CPC Carolina PR, LLC filed by Attorney Jose L. Ramirez-Coll. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795] (JLR) [Entered: 10/25/2021 03:21 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Attorney Jesus Cuza. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2021. [21-1795] (JEC) [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:52 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Attorney Rebecca Canamero. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2021. [21-1795] (RJC) [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:37 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Teichka Rodriguez- Munoz for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz, Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Teichka Rodriguez- Munoz for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1805. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 11/18/2021 10:59 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 11/12/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1791, Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1794, 21-1795, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1805. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 10/29/2021 10:23 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez in 21-1795 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795, 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:07 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez in 21-1795. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795, 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:06 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez in 21-1795 filed by Attorney Jose Luis Novas. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795, 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:04 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Edward Nieves-Roman in 21-1794 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1794, 21-1791, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:02 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Edward Nieves-Roman in 21-1794. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1794, 21-1791, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:01 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Edward Nieves-Roman in 21-1794 filed by Attorney Jose Luis Novas. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1794, 21-1791, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 12:59 PM]

Open Document

ORDER consolidating cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805 (Consolidated started 10/22/2021) with 21-1791. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 10/22/2021 04:43 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC in 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, Appellee Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC in 21-1805 filed by Attorney Rebecca Canamero. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (RJC) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:17 PM]

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Khadijah Ahmad Hamdallah in 21-1791. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/20/2021 04:26 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Khadijah Ahmad Hamdallah in 21-1791 filed by Attorney Jose Luis Novas. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/20/2021 04:25 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Teichka Rodriguez- Munoz for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz, Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Teichka Rodriguez- Munoz for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1805. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 11/18/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 11/12/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1791, Carolina V. Cabrera-Bou for CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Angel W. Rodriguez-Garayalde for Maria Teresa Cruz Marrero, Ramon Fernandez Cruz, Edgardo Jose Fernandez Cruz, Lisa Fernandez Cruz, Javier Francisco Fernandez Cruz and Wanda Ivelisse Fernandez Cruz and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1794, 21-1795, Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. in 21-1805. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 10/29/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee CPC Carolina PR, LLC filed by Attorney Jose L. Ramirez-Coll. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795] (JLR) [Entered: 10/25/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez in 21-1795 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795, 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez in 21-1795. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795, 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez in 21-1795 filed by Attorney Jose Luis Novas. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1795, 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Edward Nieves-Roman in 21-1794 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1794, 21-1791, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Edward Nieves-Roman in 21-1794. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1794, 21-1791, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Edward Nieves-Roman in 21-1794 filed by Attorney Jose Luis Novas. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1794, 21-1791, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER consolidating cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805 (Consolidated started 10/22/2021) with 21-1791. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 10/22/2021 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Attorney Jesus Cuza. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2021. [21-1795] (JEC) [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Attorney Rebecca Canamero. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2021. [21-1795] (RJC) [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC in 21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, Appellee Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC in 21-1805 filed by Attorney Rebecca Canamero. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (RJC) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Khadijah Ahmad Hamdallah in 21-1791 indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/20/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Khadijah Ahmad Hamdallah in 21-1791. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/20/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Khadijah Ahmad Hamdallah in 21-1791 filed by Attorney Jose Luis Novas. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2021. [21-1791, 21-1794, 21-1795, 21-1805] (JLN) [Entered: 10/20/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #253) filed by Appellants Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo and Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 10/26/2021. [21-1795] (GRC) [Entered: 10/12/2021 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CPC Carolina PR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant