Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:18:49 (UTC).

Nicole Ramos v. Delphi Behavioral Health Group

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Nicole Ramos filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Delphi Behavioral Health Group. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11218

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NICOLE RAMOS

Defendant / Appellee

DELPHI BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Romin N. Currier

Attorney at Pincus & Currier, LLP

1555 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Ste 320

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole M. Wall

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

222 Lakeview Ave Ste 120

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Alexandra Valdes

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Nicole Ramos. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/15/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:14 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Filer: Nicole Ramos, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/06/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/08/2021. [Entered: 06/08/2021 10:22 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexandra Valdes for Appellee Delphi Behavioral Health Group, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11218] (ECF: Alexandra Valdes) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:41 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexandra Valdes for Delphi [21-11218] (ECF: Alexandra Valdes) [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:08 AM]

Open Document

Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Dawn M. Savino, 04/26/2021, Nicole Ramos, Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/08/2021. [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:04 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Nicole Ramos, Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/08/2021. [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:02 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Romin N. Currier for Appellant Nicole Ramos. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:43 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Romin N. Currier for Appellant Nicole Ramos. [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:39 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:35 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Romin N. Currier for Nicole Ramos. [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:30 PM]

Open Document #5

Order, DE #128

Open Document #4

Order, DE #131

Open Document #3

Judgment, DE #132

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAppellant's brief is currently due on 06/15/2021. Over the phone 28 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Romin N. Currier for Appellant Nicole Ramos. Appellant's brief is now due on 07/13/2021; Appendix due on 07/20/2021 as to Appellant Nicole Ramos. [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Nicole Ramos. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/15/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Filer: Nicole Ramos, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/06/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/08/2021. [Entered: 06/08/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexandra Valdes for Appellee Delphi Behavioral Health Group, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11218] (ECF: Alexandra Valdes) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 04/28/2021 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexandra Valdes for Delphi [21-11218] (ECF: Alexandra Valdes) [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Dawn M. Savino, 04/26/2021, Nicole Ramos, Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/08/2021. [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Nicole Ramos, Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/08/2021. [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Romin N. Currier for Appellant Nicole Ramos. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Romin N. Currier for Appellant Nicole Ramos. [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Romin N. Currier for Nicole Ramos. [21-11218] (ECF: Romin Currier) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Nicole Ramos on 04/13/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/28/2021 as to Appellant Nicole Ramos. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/12/2021 as to Appellee Delphi Behavioral Health Group, LLC [Entered: 04/14/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delphi Behavioral Health Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole M. Wall