This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/31/2020 at 06:06:16 (UTC).

Nicole K., et al v. Terry Stigdon, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Nicole K filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Terry Stigdon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1525

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

THOMAS P. STEFANIAK, JR.

MARILYN A. MOORES

MARK A. JONES

TERRY J. STIGDON

MARSHA O. HOWSER

Plaintiff / Appellants

NICOLE K., by next friend LINDA R.

LILLY R., by next friend NANCY B.

RACHEL H., by next friend NANCY B.

ROMAN S., by next friend LINDA R.

ABIGAIL R., by next friend NANCY B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrea Elizabeth Rahman

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Aaron T. Craft

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert C. Fellmeth

Attorney at CHILDREN'S ADVOCACY INSTITUTE

5998 Alcala Park

San Diego, CA 92110

Stephen D. Keane

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130

Kathleen A. DeLaney

Attorney at DELANEY & DELANEY LLC

3646 N. Washington Boulevard

Indianapolis, IN 46205-0000

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1888

Deanne E. Maynard

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1888

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Attorney Motion filed by Stephen Keane for Appellants Nicole K., Roman S., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Rachel H. to withdraw as counsel [14] [7084088] [20-1525]--[Edited 05/29/2020 by AP- to reflect attorney motion filed] (Keane, Stephen) [Entered: 05/29/2020 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Robert C. Fellmeth for Appellants Nicole K., Roman S., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Rachel H. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [13] [7079703] [20-1525] (LJ) [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/01/2020 for Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S.. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/01/2020 for Marsha O. Howser, Mark A. Jones, Marilyn A. Moores, Thomas P. Stefaniak Jr. and Terry J. Stigdon. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/22/2020 for Appellants Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S. JNS [7075799] [20-1525] (VG) [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kathleen A. DeLaney for Appellants Rachel H., Nicole K., Roman S., Abigail R. and Lilly R.. [11] [7075133] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1525] (DeLaney, Kathleen) [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellees Marsha O. Howser, Mark A. Jones, Marilyn A. Moores, Thomas P. Stefaniak, Jr. and Terry J. Stigdon. [10] [7074988] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1525]--[Edited 04/15/2020 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Deanne E. Maynard for Appellants Nicole K., Roman S., Abigail R., Rachel H. and Lilly R.. Additional Parties: Anna C., Brian P., Amelia P., Alexa C., and Zachary H. by next friend Jessie R.. [9] [7074955] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1525]--[Edited 04/15/2020 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stephen D. Keane for Appellants Nicole K., Roman S., Abigail R., Rachel H. and Lilly R.. Additional Parties: Anna C., Brian P., Amelia P., Alexa C., and Zachary H. by next friend Jessie R.. [8] [7074950] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1525] (Keane, Stephen) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S.. [7] [7074889] [20-1525] (CG) [Entered: 04/14/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Nicole K., Roman S., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Rachel H.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7073345] [20-1525] (Lloyd, Seth) [Entered: 04/07/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Seth W. Lloyd for party(s) Appellant Rachel H. Appellant Abigail R. Appellant Nicole K. Appellant Lilly R. Appellant Roman S., in case 20-1525 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Seth W. Lloyd for Appellants Nicole K., Roman S., Lilly R., Rachel H. and Abigail R.. Additional Parties: Anna C., Brian P., Amelia P., Alexa C., and Zachary H. by next friend Jessie R.. [5] [7072996] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1525]--[Edited 04/06/2020 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Lloyd, Seth) [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 05/18/2020 for Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/18/2020 for Marsha O. Howser, Mark A. Jones, Marilyn A. Moores, Thomas P. Stefaniak Jr. and Terry J. Stigdon. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/09/2020 for Appellants Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S. JNS [7072642] [20-1525] (MM) [Entered: 04/03/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, April 17, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [3] [7072639] [20-1525] (MM) [Entered: 04/03/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: Anna C., Brian P., Amelia P., Alexa C. and Zachary H., by next friend Jessie R. APPELLEE: Jason M. Mount. [2] [7072225] [20-1525] (AG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S. by 04/07/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 04/15/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/11/2020 for Rachel H., Nicole K., Abigail R., Lilly R. and Roman S. [1] [7072219] [20-1525] (AG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Fellmeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deanne E. Maynard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen A. DeLaney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen D. Keane