This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/13/2021 at 05:57:39 (UTC).

New York Stock Exchange LLC, et al v. SEC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 New York Stock Exchange LLC, filed an Other lawsuit against SEC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1053

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

New York Stock Exchange LLC

NYSE Arca, Inc.

NYSE American LLC

NYSE Chicago, Inc.

NYSE National, Inc.

Respondent

Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul Mishkin

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Matthew A. Kelly

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Respondent Attorneys

Dominick V. Freda

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Daniel Staroselsky

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Martin Totaro

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1884554] filed by Martin Totaro and co-counsel Dominick Freda; Daniel Staroselsky on behalf of Respondent SEC in 21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053. [21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1884487] filed consolidating cases 21-1051, 21-1053 (Consolidation started 02/09/2021) with 21-1050; directing party to file in 21-1050 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2021 [21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1884429] filed consolidating cases 21-1053 (Consolidation started 02/09/2021) with 21-1051; directing party to file in 21-1053 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2021 [21-1051, 21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1884421] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1884419-2 ] [21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1884419] of a decision by federal agency filed by NYSE American LLC, NYSE Arca, Inc., NYSE Chicago, Inc., NYSE National, Inc. and New York Stock Exchange LLC [Service Date: 02/05/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NYSE American LLC is a litigant