Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2020 at 05:03:54 (UTC).

New York State Public Service v. FERC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 New York State Public Service filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1496

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

New York State Public Service Commission

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alina Buccella

Attorney at New York State Department of Public Service

3 Empire State Plaza

Albany, NY 12223-1350

Scott Harris Strauss

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

John J. Sipos

Attorney at New York State Department of Public Service

3 Empire State Plaza

Albany, NY 12223-1350

Amber L. Martin Stone

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Jeffrey Alan Schwarz

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Peter J. Hopkins Esquire

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1875836] filed consolidating cases 20-1496 (Consolidation started 12/15/2020) with 20-1219; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/14/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/14/2021. Petitioner in case No. 20-1496 shall adhere to the deadline for filing motions to govern set by the 12/04/2020 order in 20-1219. [20-1219, 20-1223, 20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:39 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1875762] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1875760-2 ] [20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:42 AM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1875760] of a decision by federal agency filed by New York State Public Service Commission [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:40 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1875836] filed consolidating cases 20-1496 (Consolidation started 12/15/2020) with 20-1219; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/14/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/14/2021. Petitioner in case No. 20-1496 shall adhere to the deadline for filing motions to govern set by the 12/04/2020 order in 20-1219. [20-1219, 20-1223, 20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1875762] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1875760-2 ] [20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1875760] of a decision by federal agency filed by New York State Public Service Commission [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1496] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Alan Schwarz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L. Martin Stone