This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 05:49:43 (UTC).

New York State Public Service v. FERC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 New York State Public Service filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1455

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

New York State Public Service Commission

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alina Buccella

Attorney at New York State Department of Public Service

3 Empire State Plaza

Albany, NY 12223-1350

Scott Harris Strauss

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

John J. Sipos

Attorney at New York State Department of Public Service

3 Empire State Plaza

Albany, NY 12223-1350

Peter J. Hopkins Esquire

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Respondent Attorneys

Jared Fish

Attorney at Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

888 First Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20426

Robert Harris Solomon Esquire

Attorney at Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

888 First Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20426

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1871977] filed by Jared B. Fish and co-counsel Robert H. Solomon on behalf of Respondent FERC in 20-1455, 20-1220, 20-1302, 20-1358. [20-1455, 20-1220, 20-1302, 20-1358] (Fish, Jared) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:05 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1871910] filed consolidating cases 20-1455 (Consolidation started 11/18/2020) with 20-1220; directing party to file in 20-1455 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/18/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/18/2020 [20-1220, 20-1302, 20-1358, 20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 05:14 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1871906] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1871903-2 ] [20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:58 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1871903] of a decision by federal agency filed by New York State Public Service Commission [Service Date: 11/13/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached;. [20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:55 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1871977] filed by Jared B. Fish and co-counsel Robert H. Solomon on behalf of Respondent FERC in 20-1455, 20-1220, 20-1302, 20-1358. [20-1455, 20-1220, 20-1302, 20-1358] (Fish, Jared) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1871910] filed consolidating cases 20-1455 (Consolidation started 11/18/2020) with 20-1220; directing party to file in 20-1455 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/18/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/18/2020 [20-1220, 20-1302, 20-1358, 20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1871906] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1871903-2 ] [20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1871903] of a decision by federal agency filed by New York State Public Service Commission [Service Date: 11/13/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached;. [20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1455] [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less