This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2021 at 06:59:48 (UTC).

New Orleans Equity v. U.S. Specialty

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 New Orleans Equity filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against U S Specialty. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-30544

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

New Orleans Equity L.L.C., doing business as Galatoire's Restaurant, doing business as Galatoire's 33 Bar & Steak

Defendant / Appellee

U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert E. Couhig Jr.

Attorney at Couhig Partners, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Lisa Lemaire Maher

Attorney at Couhig Partners, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Ralph H. Wall

Attorney at Couhig Partners, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jay M. Lonero

Attorney at Larzelere Picou Wells Simpson Lonero, L.L.C.

3850 N. Causeway Boulevard, 2 Lakeway Center

Metairie, LA 70002-0000

Angie Arceneaux Akers

Attorney at Larzelere Picou Wells Simpson Lonero, L.L.C.

3850 N. Causeway Boulevard, 2 Lakeway Center

Metairie, LA 70002-0000

Lara Jones Jensen

Attorney at Jensen Law, L.L.C.

404 Ridgeway Drive

Metairie, LA 70001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9660167-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/24/2021 for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. [21-30544] (CB) [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jay M. Lonero for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30544] (Jay M. Lonero ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 11:07 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30544] (Angie Arceneaux Akers ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 11:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Ralph H. Wall for New Orleans Equity L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30544] (Ralph H. Wall ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 12:08 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 09/22/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Couhig, Maher, Wall; Attorney for (null): Jensen, Lonero. [21-30544] (Ralph H. Wall ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 12:11 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/08/2021 for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C.. [21-30544] (CMB) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30544] (Robert E. Couhig Jr.) [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Lisa Lemaire Maher for New Orleans Equity L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30544] (Lisa Lemaire Maher ) [Entered: 10/05/2021 01:32 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Lisa Lemaire Maher for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. in 21-30544. [21-30544] (SEP) [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Lisa Lemaire Maher for New Orleans Equity L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30544] (Lisa Lemaire Maher ) [Entered: 10/05/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert E. Couhig Jr. for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. in 21-30544. [21-30544] (SEP) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30544] (Robert E. Couhig Jr.) [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/08/2021 for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C.. [21-30544] (CMB) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-30544] (CMB) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ralph H. Wall for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. in 21-30544 [21-30544] (CB) [Entered: 09/23/2021 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Angie Arceneaux Akers for party(s) Appellee U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, in case 21-30544. [21-30544] (SEP) [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jay M. Lonero for Appellee U.S. Specialty Insurance Company in 21-30544. [21-30544] (SEP) [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:20-CV-1935. Electronic ROA due on 10/07/2021. [21-30544] (SEP) [Entered: 09/22/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [21-30544] (SEP) [Entered: 09/22/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 09/22/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Couhig, Maher, Wall; Attorney for (null): Jensen, Lonero. [21-30544] (Ralph H. Wall ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Ralph H. Wall for New Orleans Equity L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30544] (Ralph H. Wall ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30544] (Angie Arceneaux Akers ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jay M. Lonero for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30544] (Jay M. Lonero ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9660167-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/24/2021 for Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. [21-30544] (CB) [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney Jay M. Lonero and Lara Jones Jensen added as counsel of record for Appellee U.S. Specialty Insurance Company in 21-30544 [21-30544] (CB) [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant New Orleans Equity L.L.C. [21-30544] (CB) [Entered: 09/02/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant