Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 06:00:16 (UTC).

New Jersey Dept. Environmental, et al v. American Thermoplastics Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 New Jersey Dept Environmental filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against American Thermoplastics Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2243

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

HOWMET CORP

EAGLE INDUSTRIES INC

MARS INC

CHRYSLER CORP

EMERSON QUIET KOOL

FALCON MANUFACTURING INC

BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS

OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP

EASTERN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC

COMPACTION SYSTEMS CORPORATION OF NEW JERSEY

JOHN C. FILIBERTO

GARBCO ASSOCIATES INC, FKA J Filiberto Sanitation Inc

J FILIBERTO SANITATION INC

CHESTER HILLS INC

EAGLE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS INC

FLAIR CLEANERS OF MORRISTOWN INC

MENNEN CO

RAYONIER INC

COMPTON PRESS INC

Appellee

COMBUSTION EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATES

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Louis M. DeStefano Esq.

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney

550 Broad Street, Suite 810

Newark, NJ 07102

Claudia A. Costa Esq.

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Glenn A. Harris Esq.

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Mark A. Stevens Esq.

Attorney at Langsam Stevens Silver & Hollaender

1818 Market Street, Suite 2610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Richard S. Ranieri Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

20 Independence Boulevard, Suite 201

Warren, NJ 07059

John A. McKinney Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi

One Boland Drive

West Orange, NJ 07052

Appellee Attorneys

Debra S. Rosen Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Charles J. Dennen Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Other Attorneys

Bradley L. Levine Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

John H. Klock Esq.

Attorney at Gibbons

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

Pamela S. Goodwin Esq.

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr

650 College Road East, Suite 4000

Princeton, NJ 08540

Michael D. Lichtenstein Esq.

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Louis G. Karagias Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Richard A. Catalina Esq. Jr.

Gregory L. Rofman Esq.

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel

1500 Market Street, Centre Square West, 34Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Nan A. Bernardo Esq.

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Daniel J. Sheridan Esq.

Attorney at Stark & Stark

993 Lenox Drive, Building 2

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Jeffrey M. Pollock Esq.

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

997 Lenox Drive, Princeton Pike Corporate Center, Building 3

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Robert J. Rohrberger Esq.

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

49 Market Street

Morristown, NJ 07960

Thomas J. Boer Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: Anthony J. Corino, Esq. for Public Service Electric and Gas Company NOT PARTICIPATING: will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (AJC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:46 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion by the Carter Day Appellees to Further Consolidate Related Appeals at Nos. 18-2865 and 19-2243. The appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the Carter Day Appellees' brief, and disposition. The following briefing schedule will now apply to the cases: 1. Appellant United States of America's brief and appendix in No. 19-2243, to be filed and served within forty (40) days of the date of this Order. To the extent possible, the United States should adopt or incorporate by reference the arguments made by Appellants in No. 18-2865. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). 2. Carter Day Appellees' brief, responsive to both Appellants' briefs, to be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of service of Appellant's brief in No. 19-2243. The brief may not exceed 13,000 words and should be filed in both appeals. 3. Reply briefs, if any, by the Appellants in Nos. 18-2865 and 19-2243, to be filed and served within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service of Appellees' brief. Appellants may file a consolidated reply brief, if appropriate, filed. [18-2865, 19-2243] (ARR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:43 PM]

Open Document

NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Counsel for Mennen Co requesting Not Participation Letter be re-filed listing Mennen Co. as the party. Colgate-Pamolive Company is not named as a party to the appeals. Compliance due 07/12/2019. [18-2865, 19-2243] (DW) [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:46 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant USA in 19-2243 advising this court that transcripts are not needed.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:44 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant USA in 19-2243, filed.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:42 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant USA in 19-2243, received.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:41 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrea L. Berlowe on behalf of Appellant(s) United States of America. [19-2243, 18-2865] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:40 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Colgate-Palmolive Company NOT PARTICIPATING: John A. McKinney, Jr., Esq. for Mennen Co in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (JAM) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:24 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Compaction Systems Corporation of New Jersey, filed. [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:18 PM]

Open Document #9

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #8

Standing Order

Open Document #7

Caption

Open Document #6

DC_Order_072318

Open Document #5

DC_Order_011519

Open Document #4

DC_Opinion_072318

Open Document #3

DC_Opinion_011519

Open Document #2

DC_Judgment_032019

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Anthony J. Corino, Esq. for Public Service Electric and Gas Company NOT PARTICIPATING: will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (AJC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion by the Carter Day Appellees to Further Consolidate Related Appeals at Nos. 18-2865 and 19-2243. The appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the Carter Day Appellees' brief, and disposition. The following briefing schedule will now apply to the cases: 1. Appellant United States of America's brief and appendix in No. 19-2243, to be filed and served within forty (40) days of the date of this Order. To the extent possible, the United States should adopt or incorporate by reference the arguments made by Appellants in No. 18-2865. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). 2. Carter Day Appellees' brief, responsive to both Appellants' briefs, to be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of service of Appellant's brief in No. 19-2243. The brief may not exceed 13,000 words and should be filed in both appeals. 3. Reply briefs, if any, by the Appellants in Nos. 18-2865 and 19-2243, to be filed and served within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service of Appellees' brief. Appellants may file a consolidated reply brief, if appropriate, filed. [18-2865, 19-2243] (ARR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Counsel for Mennen Co requesting Not Participation Letter be re-filed listing Mennen Co. as the party. Colgate-Pamolive Company is not named as a party to the appeals. Compliance due 07/12/2019. [18-2865, 19-2243] (DW) [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant USA in 19-2243 advising this court that transcripts are not needed.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant USA in 19-2243, filed.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant USA in 19-2243, received.--[Edited 07/09/2019 by MB] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrea L. Berlowe on behalf of Appellant(s) United States of America. [19-2243, 18-2865] (AB) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Colgate-Palmolive Company NOT PARTICIPATING: John A. McKinney, Jr., Esq. for Mennen Co in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (JAM) [Entered: 07/08/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Compaction Systems Corporation of New Jersey, filed. [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Compaction Systems Corp of Connecticut, filed. [19-2243] (JMP) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Combe Fill Corporation, filed. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Carter Day Industries Inc and Combustion Equipment Associates, filed. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Debra S. Rosen on behalf of Appellee(s) Carter Day Industries, Inc. (f/k/a Combustion Equipment Associates, Inc.) and Combe Fill Corporation. [19-2243] (DSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Waste Management Holdings, Inc., CWM Chemical Services, L.L.C. and Waste Management of New Jersey, Inc. NOT PARTICIPATING: Pamela S. Goodwin, Esq. for CWM Chemical Services Inc and Waste Management of North Jersey Inc in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [19-2243, 18-2865] (PSG) [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority NOT PARTICIPATING: Mark L. Freed, Esq. for Connecticut Resource Recovery Authority Inc in 19-2243 Appellee Connecticut Resource Recovery Authority Inc in 19-2243 will not participate in this appeal, received. [18-2865, 19-2243] (MLF) [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Nan A. Bernardo, Esq. for Warner Lambert Co.; Richard A. Catalina, Jr., Esq., Gregory L. Rofman, Esq., and Mark L. Freed, Esq. for Connecticut Resource Recovery Authority Inc, Arthur J. Clarke, Esq. for Keuffel & Esser Co, Claudia A. Costa, Esq. for Mars Inc, Louis M. DeStefano, Esq. for Eagle Industries Inc, Falcon Manufacturing Inc and Eastern Environmental Services Inc, Charles J. Dennen, Esq. and Debra S. Rosen, Esq. for Carter Day Industries Inc, Combustion Equipment Associates and Combe Fill Corporation; Pamela S. Goodwin, Esq. for CWM Chemical Services Inc and Waste Management of North Jersey Inc, Glenn A. Harris, Esq. for Beckman Instruments, Louis G. Karagias, Esq. for New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, John H. Klock, Esq. for Keuffel & Esser Co, Michael D. Lichtenstein, Esq. for Cadillac Plastics, Kevin MacGillivray, Esq. for Compton Press Inc, Hugh J. Mahoney, Esq. for Public Service Electric and Gas Co, John A. McKinney, Jr., Esq. for Mennen Co, Jeffrey M. Pollock, Esq. and Robert J. Rohrberger, Esq. for Compaction Systems Corp of Connecticut and Compaction Systems Corp, Richard S. Ranieri, Esq. for Flair Cleaners of Morristown Inc, Damon R. Sedita, Esq. for Joseph B. Filiberto, J Filiberto Sanitation Inc, John C. Filiberto and Garbco Associates Inc, Daniel J. Sheridan, Esq. for Phillips Petroleum Co and American Thermoplastics Corp, Mark A. Stevens, Esq. for Occidental Petroleum Corp and John F. Wilk, Esq. for Occidental Petroleum Corp requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/08/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 07/08/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Steven R. Baer, Esq., Thomas J. Boer, Esq., David L. Gordon, Esq. and Bradley L. Levine, Esq. for USA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/08/2019. Information Statement on or before 07/08/2019. Concise Summary on or before 07/08/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/08/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER The above-docketed appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling and disposition only. It is noted that Appellants have already filed their brief and appendix in No. 18-2865. The parties are advised that case opening forms for later filed appeals must only be filed in the new appeals and not re-filed in earlier appeals in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are further advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document, filed. [18-2865, 19-2243] (ARR) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant USA in District Court No. 2-98-cv-04781 and 2-98-cv-04812. (ARR) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rayonier, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWMET CORPORATION PENSION PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where MARS, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant