This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/29/2020 at 06:13:33 (UTC).

New Day Worldwide Inc., et al v. Taylor Swift, et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 New Day Worldwide Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Taylor Swift. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55779

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSE GRAHAM

Defendant / Appellees

SONY ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, a limited liability company

TAYLOR SWIFT, an individual

BIG MACHINE LABEL GROUP LLC, a limited liability company

KARL JOHAN SCHUSTER, an individual

DOES, 1 through 10

KOBALT MUSIC PUBLISHING AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation

UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, INC., a California Corporation

KARL MARTIN SANDBERG, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellant

NEW DAY WORLDWIDE INC.

3680 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1092

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Peter J. Anderson Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

New Day Worldwide Inc.

3680 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1092

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Jesse Graham motion to change plaintiff name. Deficiencies: None. [11804604] (QDL) [Entered: 08/27/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the record reflects that Jesse Graham signed the notice of appeal on behalf of corporate appellant New Day Worldwide Inc. A corporation must be represented by an attorney admitted to practice before this court. See In re Highley, 459 F.2d 554, 555 (9th Cir. 1972). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant New Day Worldwide Inc. shall retain counsel for the corporation, who shall file a notice of appearance in this court, or otherwise show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. If appellant New Day Worldwide Inc. fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11780833] (CKP) [Entered: 08/07/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant New Day Worldwide Inc. opening brief due 09/29/2020. Appellees Big Machine Label Group LLC, Does, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., Karl Martin Sandberg, Karl Johan Schuster, Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC, Taylor Swift and Universal Music Group, Inc. answering brief due 10/29/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11773479] (JBS) [Entered: 07/31/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOBALT MUSIC PUBLISHING AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant