This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2021 at 05:56:17 (UTC).

Neurosigma, Inc. v. Antonio De Salles, et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 Neurosigma, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Antonio De Salles. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-55129

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ANTONIO A.F. DE SALLES, an individual

ALESSANDRA GORGULHO, an individual

DOES, 1 through 10, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

NEUROSIGMA, INC., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Glenn E. Turner Esquire III

Attorney at Gibbs Giden Locher Turner Senet & Wittbrodt LLP

1880 Century Park East, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Victor F. Luke Esquire

Attorney at Gibbs Giden Locher Turner Senet & Wittbrodt LLP

1880 Century Park East, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Robert Goldstein

Attorney at The Regents of the University of California

1111 Franklin Street

Oakland, CA 94607-5200

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Donn Mortenson Esquire

Attorney at Mortenson Taggart LLP

300 Spectrum Drive, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92618

Andrew A. Wood Esquire

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 900

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Thomas D. Warren

Attorney at Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: TAH) The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 29 ]) for voluntary dismissal is granted. These consolidated appeals are dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [10459902] [17-55128, 17-55129] (JMR) [Entered: 06/05/2017 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Filed (ECF) Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. in 17-55129 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/02/2017. [10457736] [17-55128, 17-55129] (Mortenson, Michael) [Entered: 06/02/2017 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Filed Mediation order: These cases are not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [10366075] [17-55128, 17-55129] (VS) [Entered: 03/21/2017 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY and RICHARD R. CLIFTON): Appellees motions to take judicial notice (Docket Entry No. [ # 10313746-2 ] in 17- 55128, No. [17] in 17-55129) of documents in opposition to the emergency motion are granted. Pursuant to the courts February 3, 2017 order, the Clerk shall file and maintain the replies in support of the emergency motions and documents submitted in support of the replies (attachments to Docket Entry No. [ # 10306504-2 ] in 17-55128, No. [15] in 17-55129) under seal. Accordingly, appellants motions to file the replies and supporting documents under seal (Docket Entry No. [ # 10306504-2 ] in 17-55128, No. [15] in 17- 55129) are unnecessary. Appellants emergency motions to stay the district courts January 31, 2017 order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 10300316-2 ] in 17-55128, No. [3] in 17-55129) are denied. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). The temporary stay of the district courts January 31, 2017 order, entered on February 3, 2017, is lifted. The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 17-55128 and 17-55129. The following schedule shall govern these consolidated appeals: The consolidated opening brief is due July 12, 2017; the consolidated answering brief is due August 11, 2017; and the consolidated optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10321515] [17-55128, 17-55129] (AF) [Entered: 02/15/2017 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Filed Mediation order: These cases are under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 03/01/2017 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in these matters are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court..... [10320372] [17-55128, 17-55129] (VS) [Entered: 02/15/2017 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Docket(#25) Added attorney Andrew A. Wood for Neurosigma, Inc., in case 17-55129. [10316853] (Walker, Synitha) [Entered: 02/13/2017 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Docket(#24) Added attorney Glenn E. Turner III for Antonio A.F. De Salles Alessandra Gorgulho, in case 17-55129. [10316837] (Walker, Synitha) [Entered: 02/13/2017 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of andrew A. Wood for Appellant Neurosigma, Inc.. Date of service: 02/10/2017. [10315425] [17-55129] (Wood, Andrew) [Entered: 02/10/2017 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Glenn E. Turner, III for Appellees Antonio A.F. De Salles and Alessandra Gorgulho. Date of service: 02/10/2017. [10315292] [17-55129] (Turner, Glenn) [Entered: 02/10/2017 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. Correspondence: Correspondence to court regarding Appellants Reply in Support of Emergency Motion. Date of service: 02/10/2017 [10314833] [17-55129]--[COURT UPDATE: Sealed PDF per order [ # 5 ]. 02/14/2017 by LA] (Mortenson, Michael) [Entered: 02/10/2017 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • Docket(#10) Filed UNDER SEAL Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. transcript of Telephonic Settlement Conference dated May 27, 2016. Served on 02/03/2017 (Document previously submitted in [8]). [10302395] (LA) [Entered: 02/03/2017 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of sealing under Interim Circuit Rule 27-13 [8]. Filed by Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. Date of service: 02/03/2017. (Court-entered filing) [10302389] (LA) [Entered: 02/03/2017 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. notice of filing document under seal. Type of document: other (May 27, 2016 Telephonic Settlement Conference Hearing Transcript.). Date of service: 02/03/2017. [10302326] [17-55129] (Mortenson, Michael) [Entered: 02/03/2017 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Docket(#7) Added attorney Victor F. Luke for Antonio A.F. De Salles, in case 17-55129. [10302212] (Walker, Synitha) [Entered: 02/03/2017 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Victor F. Luke for Appellee Antonio A.F. De Salles. Date of service: 02/03/2017. [10302082] [17-55129] (Luke, Victor) [Entered: 02/03/2017 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY) The court has received appellants emergency motion for stay pending appeal. (Docket Entry No. [3]). The court temporarily stays the district court's January 31, 2017 order. The motion to file under seal, contained within the emergency motion for stay pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [3]), is granted. The emergency motion for a stay pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [3]) will be addressed by separate order. Accordingly, by February 6, 2017, appellees may file an opposition to the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal. Appellant may file a reply by February 7, 2017. In addition, on or before February 3, 2017, appellant shall submit a complete copy of the transcripts of the Telephonic Settlement Conference dated May 27, 2016, and the Telephonic Status Conference dated January 31, 2017. The court will set the briefing schedule for this appeal following resolution of the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [3]). The Clerk shall file the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [3]), and any further submissions pursuant to this order, under seal. [10301308] (KD) [Entered: 02/03/2017 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. Correspondence: Letter to Clker of Court. Date of service: 02/02/2017 [10300627] [17-55129] (Mortenson, Michael) [Entered: 02/02/2017 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: other (MOTION TO FILE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL UNDER SEAL). Date of service: 02/02/2017. [10300336] [17-55129] (Mortenson, Michael) [Entered: 02/02/2017 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Docket(#2) Received UNDER SEAL copy of District Court order filed on 01/31/2017. [10299939] (HH) [Entered: 02/02/2017 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/09/2017. Transcript ordered by 03/06/2017. Transcript due 06/02/2017. Appellant Neurosigma, Inc. opening brief due 07/12/2017. Appellees Antonio A.F. De Salles, Does and Alessandra Gorgulho answering brief due 08/11/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10299888] (RT) [Entered: 02/02/2017 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEUROSIGMA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew A Wood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Donn Mortenson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas David Warren