This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/18/2020 at 05:23:53 (UTC).

NeuMoDx Molecular Inc. v. HandyLab, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 NeuMoDx Molecular Inc filed an Other lawsuit against HandyLab, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2273

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

NEUMODX MOLECULAR INC.

Appellee

HANDYLAB, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

James K. Cleland

Attorney at Brinks Gilson & Lione

524 South Main Street, Suite 200

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Appellee Attorney

Heather M. Petruzzi Esq.

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/11/2020. [722067] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/30/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 09/30/2020. Certified List is due on 10/26/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Kenneth Cleland