This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:05:45 (UTC).

Neil Sorger v. Novartis Corporation Death Ben, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Neil Sorger filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Novartis Corporation Death Ben. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15224

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NEIL MARK SORGER

Defendant / Appellees

NOVARTIS CORPORATION DEATH BENEFIT & DISABILITY PLAN

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Laurence F. Padway

Attorney at Law Offices of Laurence F. Padway

1516 Oak Street

Alameda, CA 94501

David J. Linden Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of David J. Linden

P.O. Box 5780

Napa, CA 94581-0780

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sylvia Joo

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

10866 Washington Blvd., #723

Culver City, CA 90232

Ronald Keith Alberts

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

633 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11642782] (VS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:08 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 03/13/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11608630] (VS) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:58 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Neil Mark Sorger Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11601501] [20-15224] (Padway, Laurence) [Entered: 02/19/2020 10:55 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Neil Mark Sorger to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Neil Mark Sorger opening brief due 05/15/2020. Appellees Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Novartis Corporation Death Benefit & Disability Plan answering brief due 06/15/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11649873] (BG) [Entered: 04/02/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Neil Mark Sorger. New requested due date is 05/15/2020. [11649791] [20-15224] (Padway, Laurence) [Entered: 04/02/2020 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11642782] (VS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 03/13/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11608630] (VS) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11601765]. [20-15224] (AD) [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Neil Mark Sorger Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11601501] [20-15224] (Padway, Laurence) [Entered: 02/19/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Neil Mark Sorger Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/20/2020. Appellant Neil Mark Sorger opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellees Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Novartis Corporation Death Benefit & Disability Plan answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596390] (RT) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less