This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/11/2021 at 06:20:30 (UTC).

Neil Fagan v. United States of America, et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Neil Fagan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-13524

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellants

NEIL SEAN FAGAN

Miramar, FL 33025

NEIL SEAN DEHANEY FAGAN

Miami, FL 33162

Respondent / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STEWART DC WARDEN

ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY

FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, ATLANTA DISTRICT FIELD OFFICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Neil Sean Fagan

960 Millpond Rd

Miramar, FL 33025

Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan

720 Ne 160 Ter

Miami, FL 33162

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Justin Davids

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

22 Barnard St Ste 300, Po Box 8970

Savannah, GA 31401

Sarah Stevens Wilson

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 878 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

22 Barnard St Ste 300, Po Box 8970

Savannah, GA 31401

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:44 PM]

Open Document #2

DC Order

Open Document #1

Amended Notice of Appeal

Open Document

NOTICE OF FILING MISSING DOCKET ENTRY 15-1 RECORD OF DEPORTABLE / INADMISSABLE ALIEN filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/30/2021 06:07 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:50 AM]

Open Document

Notice to Appeal Doc 35 filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:17 PM]

Open Document

Notice of Filing Brief of The Appellant filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:14 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:25 AM]

Open Document #2

MP-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Returned Mail Received

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC #28 Order

Open Document #2

DC #29 Judgment

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Sarah Stevens Wilson for USA, Stewart DC Warden, Secretary of Homeland Security, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice and Field Office Director, Atlanta District Field Office. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [Entered: 12/03/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing Missing Docket Entry 15-1 Record of Deportable / Inadmissable Alien filed by Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan on11/30/2021. Please be advised that if you are requesting a relief, your notice must be filed in the form of a motion.--[Edited 12/02/2021 by CRL] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MISSING DOCKET ENTRY 15-1 RECORD OF DEPORTABLE / INADMISSABLE ALIEN filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/30/2021 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Justin Davids and Sarah Stevens Wilson for USA, Stewart DC Warden, Secretary of Homeland Security, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice and Field Office Director, Atlanta District Field Office. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appeal Doc 35 filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Brief of The Appellant filed by Party Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Neil Sean Dehaney Fagan. [21-13524] (ECF: Neil Fagan) [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail was received for Party Neil Sean Fagan. Address has been verified and updated, and mail has been re-sent. IN RE: October 19, 2021, Early briefing Letter and Certificate of Interested Persons. [Entered: 11/03/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Wilson for Respondents-Appellees [21-13524] (ECF: Sarah Wilson) [Entered: 10/22/2021 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Justin G. Davids for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, Field Office Director, Atlanta District Field Office, Secretary of Homeland Security, USA and Stewart DC Warden. [21-13524] (ECF: Justin Davids) [Entered: 10/19/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Neil Sean Fagan on 10/12/2021 Appellant brief due 40 days from 10/12/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/19/2021 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Davids

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Stevens Wilson