This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 06:14:23 (UTC).

Neighborhood Networks v. Lifestyle Publications, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Neighborhood Networks filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Lifestyle Publications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1233

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

JACQUELINE M. LYLES

Defendant / Appellee

LIFESTYLE PUBLICATIONS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellants

NEIGHBORHOOD NETWORKS PUBLISHING, INC.

N2 FRANCHISING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amy Purwin Hunt

Attorney at HORACK TALLEY PHARR & LOWNDES, PA

2600 1 Wells Fargo Street, 301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-6038

Carrie M. Francis

Attorney at STINSON LLP

1850 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Zipporah Basile Edwards

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN, PA

301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher S. Edwards Esq.

Attorney at WARD & SMITH, PA

P. O. Box 7068

Wilmington, NC 28406-7068

Alexander C. Dale

Attorney at WARD & SMITH, PA

P. O. Box 7068

Wilmington, NC 28406-7068

Hayley R. Wells

Attorney at WARD & SMITH, PA

P. O. Box 2020

Asheville, NC 28802-2020

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/03/2021. Response brief due 07/02/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000937548] [21-1233] KH [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:56 AM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/03/2021. Response brief due 06/01/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000924860] [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:37 PM]

#12

(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-1233] LHP [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:41 AM]

#11

(#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2021. Response Brief due 05/28/2021 [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/19/2021 07:30 AM]

#10

(#10) DOCKETING STATEMENT by N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:31 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000918874] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:30 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000918870] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:27 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher S. Edwards for N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. [1000918866] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:26 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alex C. Dale for N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. [1000918862] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:25 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lifestyle Publications, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000912502] [21-1233] Carrie Francis [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:50 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zipporah Basile Edwards for Lifestyle Publications, LLC. [1000912501] [21-1233] Carrie Francis [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:49 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carrie M. Francis for Lifestyle Publications, LLC. [1000912497] [21-1233] Carrie Francis [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:48 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00089-BO. Mailed to: Carries Francis, Amy Hunt. [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:27 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00089-BO. Case manager: KHancock. [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:23 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/03/2021. Response brief due 07/02/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000937548] [21-1233] KH [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/03/2021. Response brief due 06/01/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000924860] [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-1233] LHP [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2021. Response Brief due 05/28/2021 [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/19/2021 07:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETING STATEMENT by N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000918874] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000918870] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher S. Edwards for N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. [1000918866] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alex C. Dale for N2 Franchising, LLC and Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc.. [1000918862] [21-1233] Christopher Edwards [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lifestyle Publications, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000912502] [21-1233] Carrie Francis [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zipporah Basile Edwards for Lifestyle Publications, LLC. [1000912501] [21-1233] Carrie Francis [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carrie M. Francis for Lifestyle Publications, LLC. [1000912497] [21-1233] Carrie Francis [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00089-BO. Mailed to: Carries Francis, Amy Hunt. [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00089-BO. Case manager: KHancock. [21-1233] KH [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifestyle Publications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Neighborhood Networks Publishing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander C. Dale

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hayley R. Wells