This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2020 at 06:01:52 (UTC).

NC NAACP State Conference v. Ken Raymond

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 NC NAACP State Conference filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Ken Raymond. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1092

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

JEFFERSON CARMON, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections

STELLA ANDERSON, in her official capacity as Secretary of the North Carolina State Board of Elections

DAVID C. BLACK, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections

KEN RAYMOND, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections

DAMON CIRCOSTA, in his official capacity as Chair of the North Carolina State Board of Elections

Plaintiff / Appellees

CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO NAACP

MOORE COUNTY NAACP

HIGH POINT NAACP

GREENSBORO NAACP

STOKES COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP

NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP

WINSTON SALEM-FORSYTH COUNTY NAACP

Intervenors and Amicus Curiae

TIMOTHY K. MOORE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives

PHILIP E. BERGER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Amar Majmundar

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Stephanie A. Brennan

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Olga Eugenia Vysotskaya de Brito

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Paul Mason Cox

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Joshua Stein

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Irving L. Joyner Esq. I

P. O. Box 374

Cary, NC 27512

Stephen K. Wirth

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Andrew Tutt

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

John Charles Ulin Esq.

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Penda D. Hair

Attorney at FORWARD JUSTICE

P. O. Box 42521

Washington, DC 20015

James William Cooper

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Irving L. Joyner I

Attorney at IRVING JOYNER, ATTORNEY AT LAW

P. O. Box 374

Cary, NC 27512

Intervenor and Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Peter A. Patterson

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-0000

David Henry Thompson

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Nicole J. Moss

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Nicole Frazer Reaves

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Nathan A. Huff

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

4140 Parklake Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) COURT ORDER filed granting motion to intervene [ # 4 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000710942] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/27/2020 03:28 PM]

#41

(#41) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 40 ] Number of days granted: 21. Response brief due 04/29/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties.. [1000705185] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:05 AM]

40 #2

Proposed Order

40 #1

MOTION

38 #5

Appearance of Counsel

38 #4

Appearance of Counsel

38 #3

Appearance of Counsel

38 #2

Appearance of Counsel

38 #1

Amicus Curiae/Intervenor Brief (with appearance of counsel form)

4 #6

Notice of Appearance for Peter A. Patterson

4 #5

Notice of Appearance for Nicole J. Moss

#4

Notice of Appearance of Nicole Frazer Reaves

4 #3

Notice of Appearance of David H. Thompson

4 #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

4 #1

MOTION

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/09/2020. Response Brief due 04/08/2020 [20-1092] MR [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:45 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA.. [20-1092] MR [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:43 AM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA.. [20-1092] MR [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:43 AM]

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) COURT ORDER filed granting motion to intervene [ # 4 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000710942] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/27/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 40 ] Number of days granted: 21. Response brief due 04/29/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties.. [1000705185] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP and North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP to extend filing time for response brief until April 29, 2020.. Date and method of service: 03/19/2020 ecf. [1000705104] [20-1092] John Ulin [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 38 ] by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. . Number of pages: [41]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/17/2020. [1000705306] [20-1092] TW [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER filed granting filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties.. [1000703804] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Philip E. Berger, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the N.C. Senate and Timothy K. Moore, in his official capacity as Speaker of the N.C. House of Reps. in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/16/2020. [1000703119] [20-1092] David Thompson [Entered: 03/16/2020 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 35 ] by Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [6]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [2749]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/11/2020. [1000700941] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/12/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 34 ] by Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. Number of pages: [167]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/11/2020. [1000700937] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 03/12/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/10/2020. [1000698572] [20-1092] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 03/09/2020 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) BRIEF by Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/10/2020. [1000698563] [20-1092] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 03/09/2020 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David C. Black. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682042] [20-1092] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stella Anderson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682040] [20-1092] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. [1000682036] [20-1092] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ]. Number of days granted: 7. Response due 02/21/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000678020] [20-1092] MR [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP to extend filing time for Response to Motion to Intervene until February 28, 2020.. Date and method of service: 02/05/2020 ecf. [1000677513] [20-1092] John Ulin [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE ISSUED to Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta, Ken Raymond and Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP requesting response to motion to intervene [ # 4 ]. Response due 02/14/2020.[1000676318]. [20-1092] TW [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Philip E. Berger, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate and Timothy K. Moore, in his official capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives to intervene. Date and method of service: 02/04/2020 ecf. [1000675867] [20-1092] David Thompson [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/09/2020. Response Brief due 04/08/2020 [20-1092] MR [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA.. [20-1092] MR [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA. Case manager: MRadday. [20-1092] MR [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J Moss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan A. Huff