This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/18/2021 at 06:11:26 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Incorporated, et al v. HANWJH

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 NBA Properties, Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against HANWJH. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2909

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

NBA PROPERTIES, INCORPORATED

MLB ADVANCED MEDIA, L.P.

MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PROPERTIES, INCORPORATED

NHL ENTERPRISES, L.P.

NFL PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

HANWJH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at GREER, BURNS & CRAIN

300 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at GREER, BURNS & CRAIN

300 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Allyson Martin

Attorney at GREER, BURNS & CRAIN

300 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at GLACIER LAW LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Tao Liu

Attorney at GLACIER LAW LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#3

(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, November 18, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7194389] [21-2909] (PS) [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:27 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tianyu Ju for Appellant HANWJH. [4] [7194509] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909] [Edited 10/26/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:40 AM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tao Liu for Appellant HANWJH. [5] [7194545] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:41 AM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant HANWJH. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 21-2378 [6] [7194574] [21-2909] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 10/26/2021 12:16 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant HANWJH. [7] [7194578] [21-2909] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 10/26/2021 12:18 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorney Tianyu Ju to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of October 19, 2021. That order specifically required counsel to address the necessity of this appeal in light of the case cited in the order. Counsel failed to do so. It is not acceptable to simply state that both appeals should be consolidated. Accordingly, attorney Tianyu Ju shall file his response on or before November 9, 2021.Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [8] [7196589] [21-2378, 21-2909] (FP) [Entered: 11/02/2021 04:56 PM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Justin R. Gaudio for Appellees Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P. in 21-2909, Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California in 21-2378. [9] [7197928] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909, 21-2378] (Gaudio, Justin) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:13 PM]

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amy C. Ziegler for Appellees Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P. in 21-2909, Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California in 21-2378. [10] [7197929] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909, 21-2378] [10] [7197929] [21-2909, 21-2378]--[Edited 11/09/2021 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Ziegler, Amy) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:18 PM]

#11

(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Allyson M. Martin for Appellees Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P. in 21-2909, Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California in 21-2378. [11] [7197931] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909, 21-2378] [11] [7197931] [21-2909, 21-2378]--[Edited 11/09/2021 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Martin, Allyson) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:22 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/07/2022 for HANWJH. Appellees' brief due on or before 02/07/2022 for MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/28/2022 for Appellant HANWJH. RJS [7200084] [21-2909] (ER) [Entered: 11/18/2021 12:58 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/07/2022 for HANWJH. Appellees' brief due on or before 02/07/2022 for MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/28/2022 for Appellant HANWJH. RJS [7200084] [21-2909] (ER) [Entered: 11/18/2021 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Allyson M. Martin for Appellees Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P. in 21-2909, Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California in 21-2378. [11] [7197931] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909, 21-2378] [11] [7197931] [21-2909, 21-2378]--[Edited 11/09/2021 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Martin, Allyson) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amy C. Ziegler for Appellees Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P. in 21-2909, Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California in 21-2378. [10] [7197929] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909, 21-2378] [10] [7197929] [21-2909, 21-2378]--[Edited 11/09/2021 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Ziegler, Amy) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Justin R. Gaudio for Appellees Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC and NHL Enterprises, L.P. in 21-2909, Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California in 21-2378. [9] [7197928] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909, 21-2378] (Gaudio, Justin) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorney Tianyu Ju to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of October 19, 2021. That order specifically required counsel to address the necessity of this appeal in light of the case cited in the order. Counsel failed to do so. It is not acceptable to simply state that both appeals should be consolidated. Accordingly, attorney Tianyu Ju shall file his response on or before November 9, 2021.Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [8] [7196589] [21-2378, 21-2909] (FP) [Entered: 11/02/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant HANWJH. [7] [7194578] [21-2909] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 10/26/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant HANWJH. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 21-2378 [6] [7194574] [21-2909] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 10/26/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tao Liu for Appellant HANWJH. [5] [7194545] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tianyu Ju for Appellant HANWJH. [4] [7194509] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2909] [Edited 10/26/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, November 18, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7194389] [21-2909] (PS) [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC and The Regents of the University of California. [2] [7192917] [21-2909] (HTP) [Entered: 10/19/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant HANWJH by 10/25/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 11/02/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/29/2021 for HANWJH. [1] [7192911] [21-2909] (HTP) [Entered: 10/19/2021 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NHL Enterprises, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant