This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/25/2021 at 06:02:30 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Incorporated, et al v. HANWJH

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 NBA Properties, Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against HANWJH. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2378

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

NBA PROPERTIES, INCORPORATED

MLB ADVANCED MEDIA, L.P.

MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PROPERTIES, INCORPORATED

NHL ENTERPRISES, L.P.

NFL PROPERTIES, LLC

COLLEGIATE LICENSING COMPANY, LLC

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant / Appellant

HANWJH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at GREER, BURNS & CRAIN

300 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at GREER, BURNS & CRAIN

300 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Allyson Martin

Attorney at GREER, BURNS & CRAIN

300 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at GLACIER LAW PLLC

200 E. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Tao Liu

Attorney at GLACIER LAW PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California. [14] [7183308] [21-2378] (Ziegler, Amy) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Allyson M. Martin for Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California. [13] [7183305] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2378]--[Edited 09/02/2021 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Martin, Allyson) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Justin R. Gaudio for Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California. [12] [7183300] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2378]--[Edited 09/02/2021 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Gaudio, Justin) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amy C. Ziegler for Appellees Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Incorporated, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Incorporated, NFL Properties, LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. and Regents of the University of California. [11] [7183294] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2378] (Ziegler, Amy) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: The memoranda filed by appellant on August 10, 2021, and August 18, 2021. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before September 2, 2021, a response to appellants filings, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's orders of July 29, 2021, and August 10, 2021. DW [10] [7181213] [21-2378] (AG) [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant HANWJH. [9] [7180064] [21-2378] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 08/18/2021 08:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: This matter comes before the court on review of the jurisdictional memorandum filed by appellant on August 10, 2021. Appellants memorandum is inadequate. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that appellant file, on or before August 18, 2021, a supplemental memorandum identifying where, in the 14-page Memorandum Opinion and Order (district court docket entry no. 58), the district court discussed and denied appellants request to vacate the injunction. DW [8] [7178351] [21-2378] (AG) [Entered: 08/10/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant HANWJH. [7] [7178237] [21-2378] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 08/10/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant HANWJH. [6] [7178061] [21-2378] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 08/10/2021 03:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Tianyu Ju for party(s) Appellant HANWJH, in case 21-2378 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tianyu Ju for Appellant HANWJH. [5] [7176698] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2378]--[Edited 08/03/2021 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant HANWJH. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7176694] [21-2378] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tao Liu for Appellant HANWJH. [3] [7176692] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2378] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Appellant HANWJH shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7175936] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant HANWJH by 08/11/2021. [2] [7175936] [21-2378] (FP) [Entered: 07/29/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 08/10/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant HANWJH by 08/02/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/07/2021 for HANWJH. [1] [7175760] [21-2378] (FP) [Entered: 07/28/2021 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Major League Baseball Properties, Inc. is a litigant