This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/19/2021 at 06:17:35 (UTC).

Navigators Specialty Insurance v. California Bank and Trust

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Navigators Specialty Insurance filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Bank and Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-56161

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York Corporation

Defendant / Appellee

CALIFORNIA BANK AND TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Daniel S. Bernheim Esquire

Attorney at Wilentz Goldman and Spitzer PA

Two Penn Center Plaza, Suite 910

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Tod V. Beebe

Attorney at Barton, Klugman & Oetting, LLP

350 S Grand Avenue, Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3485

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12269885] [21-56161] (Bernheim, Daniel) [Entered: 10/27/2021 08:30 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellee California Bank and Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12270284] [21-56161] (Beebe, Tod) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:53 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/16/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12275315] (VS) [Entered: 11/02/2021 09:43 AM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12311448] (VS) [Entered: 12/09/2021 12:41 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12311448] (VS) [Entered: 12/09/2021 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/16/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12275315] (VS) [Entered: 11/02/2021 09:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/27/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12270429]. [21-56161] (AD) [Entered: 10/27/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/27/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12270428]. [21-56161] (AD) [Entered: 10/27/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellee California Bank and Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12270284] [21-56161] (Beebe, Tod) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12269885] [21-56161] (Bernheim, Daniel) [Entered: 10/27/2021 08:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/27/2021. Transcript ordered by 11/19/2021. Transcript due 12/20/2021. Appellant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company opening brief due 01/28/2022. Appellee California Bank and Trust answering brief due 02/28/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12263749] (JBS) [Entered: 10/20/2021 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST FKA ZB N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tod V Beebe