This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/07/2019 at 05:03:37 (UTC).

Natural Resources Defense Coun v. Department of Energy

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Natural Resources Defense Coun filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Energy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3658

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

U.S. Public Interest Research Group

Consumer Federation of America

Environment America

Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants

Natural Resources Defense Council

Sierra Club

Respondent

United States Department of Energy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Landis Esq.

Attorney at The Center for Public Interest Research, Inc.

1543 Wazee Street

Denver, CO 80202

Timothy D. Ballo Esq.

Attorney at Earthjustice

1625 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Melissa Joy Lynch Esq.

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Respondent Attorney

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent United States Department of Energy, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2700359] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:13 PM]

5 #2

Agency Enforcement/Review SERVED

5 #1

Petition_for_Review_Served_Notice

#2

(#2) AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2699050] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:29 PM]

1 #2

Agency Review FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_Pet_for_Rvw

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent United States Department of Energy, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2700359] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, SERVED. [2699063] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Petitioner Consumer Federation of America, Environment America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, USCA receipt # A02-76600-74, FILED.[2699053] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2699050] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, on behalf of Petitioner Consumer Federation of America, Environment America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. [2699036] [19-3658] [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants is a litigant

Latest cases where US PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP is a litigant