This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/15/2020 at 05:09:04 (UTC).

Natl Assn of Home Builders, et al v. OSHA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Natl Assn of Home Builders filed an Other lawsuit against OSHA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2414

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

National Association of Home Builders, of the United States

Associated Builders and Contractors

Mason Contractors Association of America

Respondents

Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor

Occupational Safety and Health Administration, U.S. Department of Labor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bradford T. Hammock

Attorney at LITTLER & MENDELSON

1650 Tysons Boulevard

Tysons Corner, VA 22102

Respondent Attorney

Joseph G. Gilliland

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

200 Constitution Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20210-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Certified Index of the Record

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Corporate Disclosure Stmt of Assoc Builders and Contractors

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Corporate Disclosure Statement Mason Contractors Assn of America

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Corporate Disclosure Statement of National Assn of Home Builders

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Petition for Review

Open Document #2

Transfer order from 3rd Circuit

Open Document #1

Transfer Circuit Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/08/2020. Brief of United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, North America Building Trades Union, Marine Specialty Painting Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Mason Contractors Association of America, National Association of Home Builders, Harsco Corporation and Mobile Abrasives, Inc. due on 09/08/2020. Responsive brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief.[4933182] [20-2407, 20-2408, 20-2413, 20-2414, 20-2416] (CMH) [Entered: 07/13/2020 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT FILED - Certified Index of the Record filed by OSHA. w/service 01/27/2020 . (ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT on 1/27/20)[4933153] [20-2414] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT FILED - Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Associated Builders and Contractors. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT on 1/10/20)[4933152] [20-2414] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT FILED - Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mason Contractors Association of America. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT on 1/10/20) [4933148] [20-2414] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT FILED - Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by National Association of Home Builders. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT on 1/1020) [4933146] [20-2414]--[Edited 07/13/2020 by AEV- edited date filed in 3rd circ] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION for Review of an order of the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, U.S. Dept of Labor (Electronic on Transfer) filed by Petitioners Associated Builders and Contractors, Mason Contractors Association of America and National Association of Home Builders w/service 11/27/2019. (ORIGINALLY Filed in the THIRD CIRCUIT on 12/26/19) [4933145] [20-2414] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketAgency case docketed [4933143] [20-2414] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Docketed On Transfer - United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit [4933121] [20-2414] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Associated Builders and Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC is a litigant