Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:14:00 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. NV Eagles, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NV Eagles, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15650

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

TORREY PINES RANCH ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.

UNDERWOOD PARTNERS, LLC

NV EAGLES, LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

LLOYD HENDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lilith Vala Xara Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Jamie Combs

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Defendant Attorney

John Henry Wright Esquire

Attorney at The Wright Law Group, P.C.

2340 Paseo Del Prado, Suite D-305

Las Vegas, NV 89102

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/30/2021, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12142330] (VS) [Entered: 06/11/2021 03:58 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/11/2021, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 9:00 a.m.). [12132963] (VS) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:34 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on June 11, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. The deadline for appellant to respond to the show cause order (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is hereby extended to allow for continued mediation efforts. By July 9, 2021, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12110310] (OC) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:23 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment on February 22, 2021. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A); Atchison, Topeka & Santa Fe Ry. Co. v. California State Bd. of Equalization, 102 F.3d 425, 427 (9th Cir. 1996) (dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction where notice of appeal not filed within 30 days after judgment entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12097746] (OC) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:04 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/10/2021, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12086812] (VS) [Entered: 04/26/2021 01:56 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant NV Eagles, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/21/2021. [12082548] [21-15650] (Wright, John) [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:44 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/30/2021, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12142330] (VS) [Entered: 06/11/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/11/2021, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 9:00 a.m.). [12132963] (VS) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) Terminated Jamie Combs for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. [12125197] (RL) [Entered: 05/26/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Jamie Combs for Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 05/26/2021. [12125194] [21-15650] (Xara, Lilith) [Entered: 05/26/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on June 11, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. The deadline for appellant to respond to the show cause order (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is hereby extended to allow for continued mediation efforts. By July 9, 2021, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12110310] (OC) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment on February 22, 2021. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A); Atchison, Topeka & Santa Fe Ry. Co. v. California State Bd. of Equalization, 102 F.3d 425, 427 (9th Cir. 1996) (dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction where notice of appeal not filed within 30 days after judgment entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12097746] (OC) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/10/2021, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12086812] (VS) [Entered: 04/26/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/21/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12082878]. [21-15650] (AD) [Entered: 04/21/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant NV Eagles, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/21/2021. [12082548] [21-15650] (Wright, John) [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant NV Eagles, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/21/2021. Appellant NV Eagles, LLC opening brief due 06/14/2021. Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC answering brief due 07/14/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12073593] (JBS) [Entered: 04/14/2021 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Underwood Partners, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NV Eagles, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant