This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:52 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Edward Kielty Trust, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Edward Kielty Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16390

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALESSI & KOENIG LLC

SUMMIT HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant / Appellee

EDWARD KIELTY TRUST

Plaintiff / Appellant

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Luis A. Ayon

Attorney at Ayon Law, PLLC

8716 Spanish Ridge Avenue, Suite 115

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jared Sechrist

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11373686] (LW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:26 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediaiton Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11373686] (LW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/22/2019. Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC opening brief due 09/10/2019. Appellee Edward Kielty Trust answering brief due 10/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363375] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less