This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/29/2020 at 06:11:51 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Nationstar Mortgage LLC, filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16893

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC

SOUTHERN HIGHLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendant / Appellant

SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellees

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Diana S. Ebron

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Karen Hanks

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas E. Belay Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 12/08/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11889145] (BLS) [Entered: 11/10/2020 05:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/10/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11853553] (BLS) [Entered: 10/09/2020 08:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/07/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11850875]. [20-16893] (AD) [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/07/2020. [11850444] [20-16893] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/07/2020. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 11/27/2020. Appellees Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC answering brief due 12/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11841861] (JBS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN HIGHLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant