Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 06:10:34 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al v. Rushmore Loan Management, et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Rushmore Loan Management. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55304

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GRICELA MENDOZA, an individual

PATRICK JOSEPH SORIA

Santa Ana, CA 92701

JENNY DE LEON, an individual

ELBA CHAVEZ, an individual

WESTWARD LEGAL, a California Corporation

DEUTSCHE MELLON NATIONAL ASSET, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company

WEST H&A, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

DOES, 1 through 10, inclusive

TAMYRA WHITE, an individual

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

CHRISTIANA WILMINGTON GLOBAL ASSET CORP., a Delaware corporation

REBEKAH BROWN, an individual

Rancho Cucamonga,, CA 91737

WARRANTED EFFECTUATION OF SUBSTITUTE TRANSFEREE, INC., a Delaware corporation, AKA W.E.S.T. Inc.

WESTWOOD LEGAL, a California Corporation

BLG PC NATIONAL BY BRIGHTON LEGAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation

Receiver

ROBB EVANS AND ASSOCIATES, LLC

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

KIMBERLY L. YAMADA-TUNG, an individual

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY LOCATED AT 390 SOUTH SEPULVEDA BOULEVARD UNIT 208, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90049, APN

3Rd Party Defendants

CENTURY 21 CITRUS REALTY

ALBERT RODRIGUEZ, an individual

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick Joseph Soria

Attorney at SANTA ANA JAIL

62 Civic Center Plaza, P.O. Box 22003

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Robert F. Conte

Attorney at USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Matthew Steven Johnshoy

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

Rebekah Brown

6371 Haven Ave.

Rancho Cucamonga,, CA 91737

Receiver Attorneys

Gary Owen Caris Esquire

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ashley R. Fickel

Attorney at Dykema Gossett LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

David Davidson

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg LLP

444 South Flower St.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Jana Logan Esquire

Attorney at Kirby & McGuinn, A P.C.

707 Broadway, Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Howard D. Hall

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 E First Street, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Jered T. Ede

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 E First Street, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Timothy A. Burnett

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 E First Street, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Yevgeniya M. Kutepova

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 E First Street, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

9510 W. Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MS): Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [12082686] (AF) [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:54 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 04/08/2021. [12069710] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [5] .] (TYL) [Entered: 04/09/2021 02:51 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12068174] (LW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:59 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MS): Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [12082686] (AF) [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 04/08/2021. [12069710] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [5] .] (TYL) [Entered: 04/09/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 6 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Intervenor Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. Date of service: 04/08/2021. [12068425] [21-55304] (Logan, Jana) [Entered: 04/08/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12068174] (LW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Matthew Steven Johnshoy for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 21-55304. [12061490] (DJV) [Entered: 04/02/2021 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew S. Johnshoy (lead counsel) (U.S. Department of Justice, P.O. Box 502, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellee USA. Date of service: 04/02/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12061467] [21-55304] (Johnshoy, Matthew) [Entered: 04/02/2021 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/07/2021. Transcript ordered by 04/28/2021. Transcript due 05/27/2021. Appellants Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust opening brief due 07/06/2021. Appellees All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in The Subject Property Located at 390 South Sepulveda Boulevard Unit 208, Los Angeles, California 90049, APN, BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc., Brighton Legal Group, PC, Rebekah Brown, Camden Legal Group, PC, Century 21 Citrus Realty, Elba Chavez, Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp., Jenny De Leon, Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, Does, Roger Franklin, Bernard Germani, Christina Gifford, HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder, Inc., Michael C. Jackson, Cynthia Lara, F. Martinez, Gricela Mendoza, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, George Wesley Pierce Jr., Robb Evans and Associates, LLC, Albert Rodriguez, Christian Soria, Patrick Joseph Soria, U.S. Bank, N.A., United States of America, Ryan Alexander Urquizu, Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee, Inc., West H&A, LLC, Westward Legal, Westwood Legal, Tamyra White and Kimberly L. Yamada-Tung answering brief due 08/06/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12059675] (RT) [Entered: 03/31/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARRANTED EFFECTUATION OF SUBSTITUTE TRANSFEREE, INC., a Delaware corporation, AKA W.E.S.T. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Westwood Legal is a litigant

Latest cases where BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc. is a litigant