This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/24/2020 at 06:33:32 (UTC).

National Urban League, et al v. Wilbur Ross, et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 National Urban League filed an Other lawsuit against Wilbur Ross. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16868

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

KING COUNTY, Washington

ADRIAN GARCIA

HARRIS COUNTY, Texas

NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE

BLACK ALLIANCE FOR JUST IMMIGRATION

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE

LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, California

CITY OF SALINAS, California

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, California

GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY

CITY OF SAN JOSE, California

NAVAJO NATION

CITY OF CHICAGO, Illinois

Amicus Curiae and Intervenor Defendant / Appellants

COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, and 18 Additional Local Governments

STATE OF LOUISIANA

STATE OF MISSISSIPPI

Defendant / Appellants

UNITED STATES CENSUS BUREAU

STEVEN DILLINGHAM, in his official capacity as Director of the U.S. Census Bureau

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Richard P. Bress

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Tyce R. Walters

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Kelly M. Percival

Attorney at Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law

120 Broadway, Suite 1750

New York, NY 10271

Anne Robinson

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Doreen N. McPaul

P.O. Box 830

Sells, AZ 85364

Michael Dundas

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

200 North Main Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Kathleen Alice Kenealy

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

200 North Main Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jacqueline Harvey

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California Street, Suite 2800

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Ilan Holtzman

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 California Street, Suite 2800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Pratik A. Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Z.W. Julius Chen

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Merrill C. Godfrey

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Paul W. Spruhan Esquire

Attorney at Navajo Nation Department of Justice

P.O. Box 2010

Window Rock, AZ 86515

Jason Searle

Attorney at Navajo Nation Department of Justice

P.O. Box 2010

Window Rock, AZ 86515

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Elizabeth B. Murrill

Attorney at Office of Attorney General Lousiana

P.O. Box 94005, Third Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Sopan Joshi

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Bradley Hinshelwood

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#45

#57

#56

#55

#54

#51

50 #2

ER Vol 2

50 #1

ER Vol 1

#49

#48

#47

#44

#43

#42

40 #2

Supplemental Addendum

40 #1

Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MN): Appellees motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 54 ]) for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due December 21, 2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11900856] (WL) [Entered: 11/20/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Filed (ECF) Appellees National Urban League, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, League of Women Voters, Harris County, King County, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, NAACP, City of Chicago, County of Los Angeles, Navajo Nation and Gila River Indian Community reply to response (). Date of service: 11/17/2020. [11895513] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC response opposing motion ([ # 54 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 54 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 11/16/2020. [11894116] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Filed (ECF) Appellees Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, County of Los Angeles, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, King County, League of Women Voters, NAACP, National Urban League and Navajo Nation Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 12/21/2020. Date of service: 11/13/2020. [11893246] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 49 ] filed by Appellants. [11877731] (DB) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 50 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellants. [11877396] (LA) [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 49 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 50 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11872038] (SML) [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau, USDOC and Steven Dillingham. Date of service: 10/23/2020. [11870542] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 10/23/2020. [11870539] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Received from the U.S. Supreme Court, order dated 10/13/2020: The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district courts September 24, 2020 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Supreme Court No. 20A62. [11856644] (HH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by BRIEF OF THE STATES OF LOUISIANA AND MISSISSIPPI AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY. Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11838405] [20-16868] (Murrill, Elizabeth) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of BENNA RUTH SOLOMON (Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago 30 North LaSalle Street - Suite 800 Chicago, IL 60602) for Appellee City of Chicago. Date of service: 09/28/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838352] [20-16868]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 09/28/2020 by SLM] (Solomon, Benna) [Entered: 09/28/2020 07:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Merrill C. Godfrey (Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, 2001 K Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellee Gila River Indian Community. Date of service: 09/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838004] [20-16868] (Godfrey, Merrill) [Entered: 09/26/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Z.W. Julius Chen (Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, 2001 K Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellee Gila River Indian Community. Date of service: 09/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838003] [20-16868] (Chen, Z.W.) [Entered: 09/26/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Pratik A. Shah (Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, 2001 K Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellee Gila River Indian Community. Date of service: 09/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838002] [20-16868] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 09/26/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed clerk order: (MN): The court has received appellants emergency motion to stay the district courts September 24, 2020 order pending appeal, and request for an immediate administrative stay pending disposition of the stay motion. Any response to the request for an immediate administrative stay is due by 9:00 a.m. (PDT) on Monday, September 28, 2020.The briefing schedule for the motion to stay pending appeal will be set by separate order. [11837973] (HH) [Entered: 09/25/2020 10:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/25/2020. [11837955] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/25/2020 07:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Bradley Hinshelwood for party(s) Appellant United States Census Bureau, Appellant Wilbur L. Ross, Appellant Steven Dillingham and Appellant USDOC, in case 20-16868. [11837865] (QDL) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bradley Alan Hinshelwood (U.S Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Room 7256, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 09/25/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11837850] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11837158] (RT) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Black Alliance for Just Immigration is a litigant

Latest cases where National Urban League is a litigant

Latest cases where League of Women Voters is a litigant