This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/17/2020 at 06:07:43 (UTC).

National Products, Inc. v. High Gear Specialties Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 National Products, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against High Gear Specialties Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1577

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NATIONAL PRODUCTS, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

HIGH GEAR SPECIALTIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David Keith Tellekson

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Jessica Kaempf

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Jonathan Gordon Tamimi

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 2Nd Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Jonathan Thomas McMichael

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Ryan Santurri

Attorney at Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, P.A.

255 South Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 16 ] filed by Appellant National Products, Inc. The opening brief is due 06/01/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [693385] [LMN] [Entered: 05/11/2020 09:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION of Appellant National Products, Inc. to extend the time to 06/01/2020 to file the opening brief due May 18, 2020. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/08/2020 by email. [693342] [20-1577] [David Tellekson] [Entered: 05/08/2020 07:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket(#15) Filing fee paid in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida on 03/27/2020. [684069] [LMN] [Entered: 04/03/2020 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#14) REMINDER : Attorney Tamimi is reminded that the information on the Entry of Appearance (EOA) and the information in the user account must match. Please promptly update the EOA or the account information on www.pacer.gov. [683628] [LMN] [Entered: 04/02/2020 08:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Entry of appearance for Jonathan G. Tamimi as of counsel for Appellant National Products, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683615] [20-1577] [Jonathan Tamimi] [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Entry of appearance for Jessica M. Kaempf as of counsel for Appellant National Products, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683614] [20-1577] [Jessica Kaempf] [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. McMichael as of counsel for Appellant National Products, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683612] [20-1577] [Jonathan McMichael] [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellant National Products, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683611] [20-1577] [David Tellekson] [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellant National Products, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683610] [20-1577] [David Tellekson] [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for David K. Tellekson as principal counsel for Appellant National Products, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683606] [20-1577] [David Tellekson] [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee High Gear Specialties Inc. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683462] [20-1577] [Ryan Santurri] [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellee High Gear Specialties Inc. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683461] [20-1577] [Ryan Santurri] [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee High Gear Specialties Inc, Docketing Statement and Certificate of Interest [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 04/08/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [683418] [LMN] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee High Gear Specialties Inc. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683356] [20-1577] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Ryan Santurri] [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee High Gear Specialties Inc. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683353] [20-1577] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Ryan Santurri] [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Ryan T. Santurri as principal counsel for Appellee High Gear Specialties Inc. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683349] [20-1577] [Ryan Santurri] [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/11/2020. [679814] Fee/IFP due on 04/01/2020. Entry of Appearance is due 04/01/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/01/2020. Docketing Statement is due 04/01/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/18/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Products Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Santurri