This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/17/2020 at 06:12:42 (UTC).

National Pork Producers Counci, et al v. Karen Ross, et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 National Pork Producers Counci, filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Karen Ross,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55631

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SONIA ANGELL, in her official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health

KAREN ROSS, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food & Agriculture

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES

THE HUMANE LEAGUE

ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

FARM SANCTUARY

COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING USA

ANIMAL EQUALITY

COMPASSION OVER KILLING

Plaintiff / Appellants

NATIONAL PORK PRODUCERS COUNCIL

AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

R. Matthew Wise Esquire

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Bruce A. Wagman

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Timothy S. Bishop

Christopher Mitchell Hendy

Dan Himmelfarb

Brett E. Legner

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#6

7 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Additional Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council opening brief due 09/23/2020. Appellees Sonia Angell, Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Xavier Becerra, Compassion Over Killing, Compassion in World Farming USA, Farm Sanctuary, Karen Ross, The Humane League and The Humane Society of the United States answering brief due 10/23/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11787034] (BG) [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council. New requested due date is 09/23/2020. [11786625] [20-55631] (Bishop, Timothy) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council Correspondence: Appellants' Notice Regarding No Transcript Ordered. Date of service: 06/25/2020 [11733414] [20-55631] (Bishop, Timothy) [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [11732439] (BLS) [Entered: 06/24/2020 02:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Brett E. Legner for party(s) Appellant National Pork Producers Council Appellant American Farm Bureau Federation, in case 20-55631. [11731639] (RR) [Entered: 06/24/2020 07:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brett E. Legner (Mayer Brown LLP, 71 South Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606-4637) for Appellants National Pork Producers Council and American Farm Bureau Federation. Date of service: 06/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11730987] [20-55631] (Legner, Brett) [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/23/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11730726]. [20-55631] (AD) [Entered: 06/23/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/23/2020. [11730543] [20-55631] (Bishop, Timothy) [Entered: 06/23/2020 11:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/25/2020. Appellants American Farm Bureau Federation and National Pork Producers Council opening brief due 08/24/2020. Appellees Sonia Angell, Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Xavier Becerra, Compassion Over Killing, Compassion in World Farming USA, Farm Sanctuary, Karen Ross, The Humane League and The Humane Society of the United States answering brief due 09/24/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11726296] (RT) [Entered: 06/18/2020 01:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less