This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/04/2022 at 06:30:00 (UTC).

National Labor Relations Board v. AT&T Mobility Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 National Labor Relations Board filed an Other lawsuit against AT T Mobility Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-11614

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

Respondent

AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ruth E. Burdick

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half St Se Fl 4

Washington, DC 20003

Respondent Attorneys

Sheldon W. Snipe

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc.

754 Peachtree St Ne Ste 07-C764

Atlanta, GA 30308

Andrew Wagner

Attorney at AT&T Mobility Services, LLC

8041 Dani Dr

Fort Myers, FL 33966

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

David Cohen

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 530

Tampa, FL 33602-5824

Cesar Custodio

Attorney at Communication Workers of America

2220 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32804

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Application for Enforcement

Open Document #3

Proposed Judgment

Open Document #4

Certificate of Record

Open Document #5

Certificate of Interested Persons

Open Document #6

Certificate of Service

Open Document #7

Service List

Open Document #8

Transmittal

Open Document #9

Agency Record

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ruth E. Burdick for National Labor Relations Board. [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:48 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Ruth E. Burdick for Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:49 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ruth E. Burdick for Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:50 PM]

Open Document

Administrative Agency Record on Appeal Filed. [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:50 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Returned Mail was received for Attorney Andrew Wagner for Respondent AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. IN RE: 05/13/2022, DKT-9 Letter [Entered: 05/31/2022 08:55 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail was received for Attorney Andrew Wagner for Respondent AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. IN RE: 05/13/2022, DKT-9 Letter [Entered: 05/31/2022 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdministrative Agency Record on Appeal Filed. [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ruth E. Burdick for Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Ruth E. Burdick for Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ruth E. Burdick for National Labor Relations Board. [22-11614] (ECF: Ruth Burdick) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT DOCKETED. Application for Consent Judgment filed by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. [Entered: 05/13/2022 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Cohen