This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2022 at 06:01:53 (UTC).

National Horsemen's Assoc v. Black

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 National Horsemen's Assoc filed an Other lawsuit against Black. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10387

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiffs

State of Texas

Texas Racing Commission

Plaintiff / Appellants

National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association

Defendant / Appellees

Jerry Black

Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated

Federal Trade Commission

Commissioner Kelly Slaughter

Commissioner Rohit Chopra

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Lanora Christine Pettit

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc-059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Cody Tyler Rutowski

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

209 W. 14Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Robert Suhr

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

440 N. Wells Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Fernando Manuel Bustos

Attorney at Bustos Law Firm, P.C.

1001 Main Street

Lubbock, TX 79401

Jeffrey Jennings

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

440 N. Wells Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Reilly Stephens

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

440 N. Wells Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Pratik A. Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, L.L.P.

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Lide E. Paterno

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, L.L.P.

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Joseph Forrest Busa

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Mark Bernard Stern Esq.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9851836-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/20/2022 09:50 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/27/2022 for Appellants Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, State of Texas, Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Texas Racing Commission and Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association. [22-10387] (DDL) [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:49 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Lide E. Paterno for Ms. Katrina Adams, Mr. Jerry Black, Mr. Leonard Coleman, Ms. Nancy Cox, Mr. Joseph Dunford, Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated, Mr. Frank Keating and Mr. Kenneth Schanzer for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10387] (Lide E. Paterno ) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Pratik A. Shah for Ms. Katrina Adams, Mr. Jerry Black, Mr. Leonard Coleman, Ms. Nancy Cox, Mr. Joseph Dunford, Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated, Mr. Frank Keating and Mr. Kenneth Schanzer for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10387] (Pratik A. Shah ) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:09 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

Transcript order form

Open Document #1

Reptr-1 Letter

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

No Description Available

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Taylor Gifford is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:per email from lead counsel. [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/24/2022 09:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9851836-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/20/2022 09:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Brennan Meier is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:per email this date. [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Brian Walters Stoltz and Alexander V. Sverdlov is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:per email from lead counsel. [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketAMENDED APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Kenneth Schanzer in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Frank Keating in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Joseph Dunford in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Nancy Cox in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Leonard Coleman in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Katrina Adams in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated in 22-10387, Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Jerry Black in 22-10387 [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketAMENDED APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Kenneth Schanzer in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Frank Keating in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Joseph Dunford in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Nancy Cox in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Leonard Coleman in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Katrina Adams in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated in 22-10387, Attorney Lide E. Paterno for Appellee Jerry Black in 22-10387 [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/27/2022 for Appellants Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, State of Texas, Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Texas Racing Commission and Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association. [22-10387] (DDL) [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10387] (DDL) [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Lide E. Paterno for Ms. Katrina Adams, Mr. Jerry Black, Mr. Leonard Coleman, Ms. Nancy Cox, Mr. Joseph Dunford, Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated, Mr. Frank Keating and Mr. Kenneth Schanzer for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10387] (Lide E. Paterno ) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Pratik A. Shah for Ms. Katrina Adams, Mr. Jerry Black, Mr. Leonard Coleman, Ms. Nancy Cox, Mr. Joseph Dunford, Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated, Mr. Frank Keating and Mr. Kenneth Schanzer for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10387] (Pratik A. Shah ) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10387] (Fernando Manuel Bustos ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10387] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants State of Texas and Texas Racing Commission. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mechelle Daniel, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/16/2022. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 05/02/2022 for Mechelle Daniel, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9828552-2 ] [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants State of Texas and Texas Racing Commissionfor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/21/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Gifford, Jennings, Suhr; Attorney for Appellees: Meier, Paterno, Stoltz; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stephens; Attorney for Appellee: Sverdlov. [22-10387] (Taylor K. Gifford ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellants National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association and Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association in 22-10387 [ # 9828008-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 04/25/2022 by 12:00 pm. [22-10387] (MBC) [Entered: 04/21/2022 10:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9828011-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/05/2022 for Appellants Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, State of Texas, Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Texas Racing Commission and Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association [22-10387] (LEF) [Entered: 04/20/2022 08:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association and Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association to expedite the appeal [9828008-2]. Date of service: 04/20/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Gifford, Jennings, Stephens, Suhr; Attorney for Appellees: Meier, Paterno, Stoltz, Sverdlov [22-10387] (Daniel Robert Suhr ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 08:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Daniel Robert Suhr for Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association and Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10387] (Daniel Robert Suhr ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 08:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9827603-2] Parties added: Appellants State of Texas and Texas Racing Commission. NOA filed by Appellants Texas Racing Commission and State of Texas. [9827603-1] [22-10387] (AS) [Entered: 04/20/2022 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Arizona Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Arkansas Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Illinois Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Indiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Louisiana Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Mountaineer Park Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Nebraska Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oklahoma Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Oregon Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Pennsylvania Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, Tampa Bay Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association and Washington Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association [22-10387] (AS) [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lide E. Paterno

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Forrest Busa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pratik Arvind Shah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark B. Stern